Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 57454
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/2011Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
01/04/2011Petition/WritFiled Motion for Stay and Petition for Writ of Mandamus Prohibition.11-00214
01/04/2011MotionFiled Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.11-00291
01/06/2011MotionFiled Motion to File Supplement to Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Petition for Writ of Mandamus Prohibition.11-00616
01/06/2011Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Prohibition11-00618
01/06/2011MotionFiled Supplement to Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.11-00619
01/25/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." Fn1 [We deny the motion for stay filed on January 4, 2011.]11-02500
02/22/2011RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur11-05424
02/22/2011Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed