Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 57956
Short Caption:PROVINCIAL GOV. OF MARINDUQUE VS. PLACER DOME, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A511078Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:03/21/2011 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/03/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/03/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/16/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
03/16/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) A511078 PROVINCIAL11-08010
03/16/2011OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: (Morris Peterson)
03/16/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.11-08013
03/18/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer. Check No. 11177.
03/21/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield.11-08557
04/04/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.11-10007
04/05/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge-Docketing Statement.11-10097
04/05/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service for Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge.11-10140
04/25/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the program.11-12114
04/29/2011Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.11-12745
05/16/2011Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification Regarding Transcript of Proceedings.11-14477
07/11/2011MotionFiled Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time.11-20610
07/11/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due August 29, 2011.11-20612
07/28/2011MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel - Colorada Attorney Jessica E. Yates of Snell & Wilmer.11-22796
08/26/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney Jessica E. Yates shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant in this appeal. Nevada attorney Patrick G. Bryne shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Yates in this matter.11-26096
08/29/2011BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.11-26286
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 1 (part 1).11-26317
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 1 (part 2).11-26318
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 2.11-26319
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 3 (part 1).11-26320
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 3 (part 2).11-26321
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 4.11-26326
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 5 (part 1).11-26327
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 5 (part 2).11-26328
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 6 (part 1).11-26329
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 6 (part 2).11-26330
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 7 (part 1).11-26331
08/30/2011AppendixFiled ndix Joint Appendix Vol 7 (part 2).11-26332
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 7 (part 3).11-26333
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 8 (part 1).11-26334
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 8 (part 2).11-26336
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 9.11-26337
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 10.11-26338
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 11 (part 1).11-26339
08/30/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 11 (part 2).11-26340
08/30/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Joint Appendix Vols 1 thru 11.11-26341
09/21/2011MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Answering Brief.11-28820
09/21/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due by October 28, 2011.11-28822
10/31/2011BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.11-33320
11/15/2011MotionFiled Stipulated Motion for Stay.11-35200
12/06/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Suspending Briefing Schedule. Appellant: Status report due: 90 days.11-37271
03/05/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.12-07043
03/08/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name (Morris Peterson to Morris Law Group).12-07487
03/08/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Corrected Notice of Change of Firm Name (Morris Peterson to Morris Law Group).12-07500
05/25/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Status Report. Having considered the status report, we conclude that the stay should remain in place. Appellant shall file a second status report concerning settlement within 90 days from the date of this order.12-16593
08/24/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.12-26922
08/31/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Having considered the status report, we conclude that the stay should remain in place. Appellant shall file a third status report concerning settlement within 90 days from the date of this order.12-27682
11/30/2012MotionFiled Stipulated Status Report.12-37750
01/29/2013MotionFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-03057
02/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.13-04280
03/06/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address for Martin Cunniff.13-06849
04/11/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-10772
04/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. In the latest status report, filed on April 11, 2013, appellant requests an additional 60-day stay to focus on settlement. Having considered the status report, we conclude that the stay should remain in place. Appellant shal file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.13-12408
05/24/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address for Edward Han.13-15463
06/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-16918
07/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. In the latest status report, filed on June 10, 2013, appellant requests an additional 60-day stay to focus on the settlement. Having considered the status report, we conclude that the stay should remain in place. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.13-21494
09/23/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-28417
10/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Appellant: Updated Status Report due: 14 days.13-29197
10/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-30888
11/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.13-32973
12/27/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.13-39414
01/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.14-01007
03/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.14-08035
03/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Having considered the status report, we conclude that the stay should remain in place. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 60 days from the date of this order.14-09232
05/22/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Stipulated Status Report.14-16740
05/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Status Report. Appellant shall file an updated status report concerning settlement within 30 days from the date of this order.14-17413
06/30/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report.14-21272
06/30/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Status Report and Request to Vacate Stay.14-21343
07/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. We vacate the stay imposed by our December 6, 2011, order and reinstate briefing as follows. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days.14-23248
08/19/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address for Walter J. "Skip" Scott. (Pro hac vica counsel for appellant).14-27190
08/19/2014MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of David Ammons as Counsel for Appellant.14-27192
08/20/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Accept Reply Brief. (DETACHED AND FILED REPLY BRIEF PER ORDER 8/25/2014).14-27532
08/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief from appellant's August 20, 2014, motion, and file the brief.14-28007
08/25/2014BriefFiled Reply Brief14-28008
08/25/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove David Ammons as appellant's counsel in this appeal. As Reda Hicks and James D. McCarthy of Diamond McCarthy; Neil Peck, Jessica E. Yates, and Patrick G. Byrne of Snell & Wilmer, LLP; and Walter J. Scott continue to represent appellant in this matter, no further action will be taken with regard to appellant's representation.14-28588
11/06/2014MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Reda Hicks as Counsel for Appellant.14-36768
12/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We direct the clerk of this court to remove attorney Hicks as counsel of record for appellant. James McCarthy of Diamond McCarthy, LLP; Walter Scott, and Neil Peck, Jessica Yates, and Patrick Byrne of Snell & Wilmer, LLP, will remain as counsel of record for appellant.14-39687
12/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-42064
01/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, February 3, 2015, @ 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-00409
01/21/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.15-02181
01/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-02196
01/28/2015BriefFiled Respondents' Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.15-03050
02/02/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Objection to Respondent's Response to Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.15-03438
02/03/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 21, 2015, appellant filed notice of supplemental authority in this matter. Respondents filed a response to the notice, and appellants have filed an objection to the response. The objection is noted, and this court will not consider any documents not properly before this court when resolving the merits of this appeal.15-07392
03/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Jim McCarthy/Diamond McCarthy.15-08052
06/11/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. EN BANC15-17762
07/06/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-20366
07/06/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/21/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 15, 2015.15-20366