The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58283
Short Caption:WELLS FARGO BANK VS. RENSLOWClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1003382Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/02/2012 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/02/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/05/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) NOTICE OF APPEAL11-13287
05/05/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.11-13290
05/10/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer check no. 11317.
05/18/2011Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request . Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested.11-14730
05/25/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Constitutionality Issue.11-15490
05/25/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.11-15491
05/25/2011MotionFiled Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal.11-15496
06/14/2011MotionFiled Verified Application for Association of Counsel Under Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42. (Andrew Jacobs).11-17737
07/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Attorney General: Certification of Constitutional Issue.11-21476
07/22/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Associate Counsel. The motion to associate counsel is denied. The motion may be refiled once an SCR 42(b) statement is obtained.11-22102
08/17/2011MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Andrew Martin Jacobs).11-25095
08/29/2011MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief.11-26282
08/29/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: October 3, 2011.11-26284
09/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Appellant Wells Fargo Bank has filed a motion to associate Arizona attorney Andrew Martin Jacobs of the law firm Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P. in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. Mr. Jacobs shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant in this appeal.11-29443
10/03/2011BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.11-30125
10/03/2011MotionFiled Request for Judicial Notice.11-30127
10/03/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume I.11-30128
10/03/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume II.11-30129
10/13/2011MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.11-31505
10/13/2011BriefReceived Amicus Brief of United Trustees Association (via E-Flex). (FILED PER ORDER 11/08/2011).
10/27/2011MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief.11-33261
11/08/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Amicus Brief and Approving Stipulation to Extend Time. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus curiae brief received on October 13, 2011. Respondents' (single) Answering Brief due: December 2, 2011. Reply Brief due: 45 days from service of answering brief.11-34395
11/08/2011BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of United Trustees Association.11-34396
12/02/2011BriefFiled Answering Brief11-37025
12/02/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service Affidavit of Mailing.11-37038
12/09/2011BriefFiled The State of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief.11-37848
12/13/2011MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.11-38193
12/13/2011BriefReceived Brief of Amicus Curiae Civil Rights for Seniors Supporting Affirmance in Favor of Respondent. (FILED PER ORDER 12/27/11)
12/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus curiae brief provisionally received in this court on December 13, 2011.11-39633
12/27/2011BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Civil Rights for Seniors Supporting Affirmance in Favor of Respondent.11-39636
01/19/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-01905
01/19/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/07/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Judicial Notice.12-03997
02/21/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Number (Philip A. Olsen).12-05425
08/23/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 2, 2012, @ 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-26585
09/17/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.12-29247
09/19/2012MotionFiled Motion to Postpone Oral Argument for 30 Days.12-29676
09/24/2012MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Postpone Oral Argument for 30 Days.12-30072
09/25/2012MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Postpone Oral Argument for 30 Days.12-30301
09/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The oral argument presently scheduled for Tuesday, October 2, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. shall proceed as scheduled.12-30594
09/28/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Joyce Kotnik-Klevins with KSNV Las Vegas Ch. 3 NBC requesting Permission to Video Tape Oral Argument on October 2, 2012 (via fax).12-30770
10/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage. Joyce Kotnik-Klevins of KSNV Las Vegas is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. Nos. 58283/5955712-30839
10/02/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Kyle Gillis with Nevada Journal requesting a media pass for oral argument on Tuesday, October 1.12-31060
10/02/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.