Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58519
Short Caption:HOHENSTEIN VS. NEV. EMPLOYMENT SECURITYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1003449Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/17/2013 / Crowley, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/13/2014 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/13/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
06/08/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.11-16838
06/08/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.11-16842
06/17/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Copy of Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis or in the Alternative Noticed Motion to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed in district court on 6/13/11.11-18035
06/17/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. (D.C. order granting motion filed on 6/13/11.)
06/17/2011Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
07/28/2011BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.11-22733
09/28/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address.11-29562
10/21/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days.11-32588
11/18/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol 1.11-35701
11/18/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol 2.11-35702
11/18/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/20/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. We direct appellant to inform this court within 11 days from the date of this order whether he would consent to the appointment of pro bono counsel. If appellant declines pro bono counsel, oral argument will not be held.12-40336
01/02/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Response to Order.13-00022
01/02/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notification of Change of Address.13-00023
02/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel and Establishing Briefing Schedule. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of appointing Mr. Lemieux as pro bono counsel for appellant. District court order due: 35 days. Mr. Lemieux shall have 15 days from the date the district court's transmission of the document appointing him as appellate counsel to enter an appearance in this court. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of Mr. Lemieux's appearance to file and serve his opening brief and appendix, respondents shall have 30 days from the date the opening brief and appendix are served to file the answering brief, and appellant shall have 30 days from the date the answering brief is served to file any reply brief.13-04283
02/27/2013Order/IncomingFiled District court order Appointing Darren J. Lemieux as pro bono counsel. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 2/26/13.13-06101
03/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (Darren J. Lemieux of the law firm Lewis and Roca, LLP for appellant Clinton Hohenstein.)13-07378
04/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Notice of Intent to Participate (Christopher B. Reich and Randy A. Drake appearing on behalf of Respondent Washoe County School District, as the employer).13-10469
04/18/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Requesting Transfer of Case to Supreme Court Settlement Program.13-11532
05/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Referring to Settlement Program. Cause appearing, we approve the parties' "Stipulation Requesting Transfer of Case to Supreme Court Settlement Program." See NRAP 16. Accordingly, briefing is stayed and this appeal is referred to the settlement program. In light of the amount of time this appeal has been pending, the assigned settlement judge shall expedite settlement proceedings and file a Final Settlement Program Status Report within 90 days of assignment.13-14351
05/17/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Margaret M. Crowley13-14620
06/21/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 07/31/13.13-18306
08/19/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-24415
09/06/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-26363
09/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. (Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP/Reno)13-26622
09/16/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested.13-27291
10/31/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Caryn S. Tijsseling of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg appearing on behalf of Appellant).13-32731
12/06/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-36699
12/06/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.13-36701
12/06/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. 2.13-36703
12/23/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which the Respondents Have to File and Serve Their Answering Brief.13-39015
12/23/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: February 5, 2014.13-39054
02/03/2014BriefFiled Respondent ESD's Answering Brief.14-03380
02/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Addendum to Respondent ESD's Answering Brief.14-03382
02/05/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Washoe County School District's Notice of Joinder in the Respondent ESD's Answering Brief Pursuant to Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure, Rule 28 (i).14-03685
02/06/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.14-03992
02/06/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 3, 2014.14-03999
04/04/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-10693
04/04/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/24/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled on the next available calendar.14-20683
07/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-22293
07/31/2014MotionFiled Motion to Postpone Oral Argument.14-24947
07/31/2014MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition of Motion to Postpone Oral Argument.14-24984
07/31/2014MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Postpone Oral Argument.14-25084
08/06/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Continuing Oral Argument. The oral argument presently scheduled for September 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument before the northern panel on the next available calendar. Oral argument will be limited to 30 minutes.14-25773
10/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, November 13, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes.14-33350
10/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-36101
11/13/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP14 KP/RP/NS.
04/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Saitta. 131 Nev. Adv. Op. No. 17. NNP14-KP/RP/NS15-09909
04/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-12654
04/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/08/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 30, 2015.15-12654