Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58562
Short Caption:CENTOFANTI, III (ALFRED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):38987, 43895, 44984, 52994, 78193, 78193-COA, 82684
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172534Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Senior Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/25/2012How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/13/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.11-17571
06/23/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Temporary Remand. District Court: written or minute order appointing appellate counsel due: 35 days.11-18717
07/18/2011Order/IncomingFiled District Court Minute Order appointing Rochelle Nguyen as counsel for appellant entered in district court on 07/11/2011.11-21489
07/26/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Briefing Schedule. Briefing of this appeal shall proceed. Transcript Request and Docketing Statement due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90.11-22450
07/26/2011MotionFiled Motion to Remand.11-22517
08/02/2011MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Remand.11-23254
08/12/2011Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Request.11-24601
08/12/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.11-24602
08/26/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to File Opening Brief11-26148
08/31/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 23, 2011.11-26545
11/18/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Remand.11-35642
12/19/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request).11-38895
12/22/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 23, 2012.11-39463
01/24/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Length of Opening Brief.12-02418
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1.12-02423
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2.12-02425
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3.12-02426
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4.12-02427
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5.12-02428
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6.12-02429
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7.12-02430
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 8.12-02431
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 9.12-02440
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 10.12-02441
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 11.12-02443
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 12.12-02444
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 13.12-02445
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 14.12-02446
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 15.12-02447
01/24/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 16.12-02448
02/22/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on January 24, 2012. Respondent: 30 days to file answering brief.12-05709
02/22/2012BriefFiled Opening Brief -Appellant's Opening Brief.12-05712
03/23/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief.12-09376
03/23/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Answering Brief due April 23, 2012.12-09378
04/23/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.12-12938
05/11/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to File Reply Brief.12-15070
05/11/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Reply Brief due: June 23, 2012.12-15072
06/25/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-19885
06/25/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
12/05/2012OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
06/03/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP13-JH/RP/MC13-16213
06/21/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny appellant's motion for leave to file pleadings in proper person and his motion for leave to file additional pleadings. The clerk of this court shall return the proper person petition for rehearing unfiled. Post-conviction counsel shall have 18 days from the date of this order to file a petition for rehearing if counsel deems such a petition to be warranted.13-18329
07/10/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: July 16, 2013.13-20099
07/12/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.13-20560
09/25/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).13-28667
10/04/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Rehearing.13-29603
10/07/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to appellant Alfred Centofanti, III in response to his request for extension of time to file en banc reconsideration.13-29925
11/06/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, voluntarily recuses himself from participating in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC13-33343
12/02/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-36046
12/02/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/13/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 5, 2013.13-36046