Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58579
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/11/2011How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/17/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/17/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.11-17982
06/22/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed on or about 06/17/2011.11-18542
06/29/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Response to 6/22/11 Notice (Attached is Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law Order filed in district court on 6/17/11).11-19354
07/21/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days.11-22045
08/11/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vols 1 thru 8 (via FTP).11-24410
08/11/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/15/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED).
11/15/2011OtherChief Justice Nancy M. Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
11/15/2011OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
02/08/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.]12-04218
03/05/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur.12-06977
03/05/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/15/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Distict Court Clerk on March 12, 2012.12-06977