Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58711
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/04/2014 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/04/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/01/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)11-19615
07/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.11-19617
07/05/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person.11-19921
07/12/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/23/08; 8/27/08; 9/10/08; 9/29/08; 1/26/09; 1/28/09; 2/9/09; 2/18/09; 2/25/09; 6/3/09; 7/16/09; 8/3/09; 8/24/09; 9/28/09; 11/9/09; 12/2/09; 1/4/10; 1/6/10; 1/27/10; 10/13/10; 11/1/10; 11/4/10; 11/18/10; 2/10/11; 2/14/11 thru 2/18/11; 2/22/11 thru 2/25/11; 2/28/11; 3/1/11; 3/3/11; 5/10/11 & 5/31/11. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas; Gina Shrader; Sharon Howard; Beverly Sigurnik; Julie Lever and Robert Cangemi Filed in district court on: July 11, 2011.11-20784
08/10/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time Due To Missing Transcripts.11-24326
08/17/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: July 23, 2008.11-24999
08/22/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporters Gina Shrader, Sharon Howard, and Julie Lever, and Court Recorder Beverly Sigurnik: Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 10, 2011.11-25436
09/06/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Lever stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/18/10.11-26987
09/07/2011MotionFiled Reporter's Request for Extension for Preparation of Transripts (Court Reporter Sharon Howard).11-27057
09/13/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Sharon Howard's Certificate of Delivery due: November 30, 2011. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: December 30, 2011.11-27782
11/17/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/04/10, 2/10/11, 3/03/11, 5/31/11, 2/14/11, 2/15/11, 2/16/11, 2/17/11, 2/18/11, 2/22/11, 2/23/11, 2/24/11, 2/28/11, and 3/01/11. (2/25/11 was requested but the jury was still deliberating and had not yet reached a verdict; there was nothing heard outside the presence on the record for that day).11-35591
12/30/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts.11-40195
01/09/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's counsel shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file, and serve on the correct court reporter/recorder, an amended rough draft transcript request form requesting those transcripts still necessary for identifying and briefing appellate issues. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 28, 2012.12-00709
01/10/2012Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/29/80; 1/26/09; 1/28/09; 2/9/09; 2/18/09; 2/25/09; 6/3/09; 7/16/09; 8/3/09; 8/24/09; 9/28/09; 11/9/09; 12/2/09; 1/6/10 & 1/27/10. Court Reporter: Julie Lever and Beverly Sigurnik. Filed in district court on: 1/10/12.12-00971
02/02/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Returning Document Unfiled. Appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal and has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person document received on Janaury 30, 2012. Hereafter, appellant shall proceed by and through his counsel of record.12-03640
02/28/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts.12-06364
03/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Ms. Sigurnik: 14 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in the district court and deliver transcripts to counsel and file a notice of delivery with the clerk of this court. Fn2[If Ms. Sigurnik believes she is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order].12-06671
03/02/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 30, 2012.12-06809
03/07/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Beverly Sigurnik stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/09; 1/28/09; 2/9/09; 2/18/09; 2/25/09; 6/3/09; 7/16/09; 8/2/09; 8/24/09; 9/28/09; 11/9/09; 12/2/09; 1/6/10 & 1/27/10 is a minute order.12-07453
05/01/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix.12-13657
05/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days.12-15146
06/12/2012MotionFiled Motion for the Extension of Time. (Fast Track Statement and Appendix)12-18350
06/15/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 11, 2012.12-18812
07/12/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-21943
07/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: July 30, 2012.12-22166
07/31/2012MotionFiled Motion for Ten Day Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-24053
08/03/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days.12-24525
08/13/2012MotionFiled Motion To Allow Full Briefing.12-25367
08/16/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days.12-25892
09/14/2012MotionFiled Stipulation to file Opening Brief.12-29172
09/14/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due October 17, 2012.12-29175
10/17/2012MotionFiled Motion for Three Day Extension of Time.12-33029
10/23/2012MotionFiled Motion for Two Day Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix.12-33533
10/25/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.12-33805
10/25/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Opening brief and appendix due: October 29, 2012.12-33879
10/30/2012MotionFiled Motion for One Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.12-34181
10/31/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Limitations.12-34317
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1.12-34318
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2.12-34319
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3.12-34320
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4.12-34321
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5.12-34322
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6.12-34323
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7.12-34324
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 8.12-34325
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 9.12-34326
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 10.12-34327
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 11.12-34328
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 12.12-34329
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 13.12-34330
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 14.12-34331
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 15.12-34332
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 16.12-34333
10/31/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 17.12-34335
11/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief received via E-Flex on October 31, 2012. Appellant shall have 30 days to file an opening brief that does not exceed 80 pages or contains no more than 37,000 words. Fn1[The motion for an extension of time is denied as moot.]12-37385
12/27/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief. (January 8, 2013)12-41029
12/31/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due: January 8, 2013.12-41195
01/08/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief.13-00659
02/07/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time First Request. (60 days)13-03972
02/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: April 8, 2013.13-04880
04/08/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request - Answering Brief).13-10114
04/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until May 8, 2013, to file and serve the answering brief.13-10801
05/08/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time Third Request.13-13514
05/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: June 7, 2013.13-14740
06/07/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time. Fourth Request.13-16763
06/21/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion.Respondent's answering brief due: July 22, 2013.13-18308
07/23/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 8/09/13).
07/23/2013AppendixFiled Brief Respondent's Appendix.13-21528
07/30/2013MotionFiled Motion to Strike Respondent's Answering Brief.13-22406
07/31/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike respondent's Answering Brief and Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitations.13-22552
08/05/2013MotionFiled Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion to Strike Answering Brief.13-22852
08/09/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Striking Answering Brief. Appellant has filed a motion to strike the answering brief on the grounds that it does not comply with the page or type-volume limitations imposed by NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) and was not accompanied by a motion for leave to file a brief that exceeds those limitations as required by NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). We agree and grant the motion to strike respondent's brief. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the answering brief filed on July 23, 2013. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief that complies with NRAP 32(a)(1)-(6). Respondent may file an answering brief that does not exceed 80 pages or contains no more than 37,000 words.13-23445
08/28/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-25525
09/25/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.13-28636
09/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 28, 2013.13-28716
10/28/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief.13-32284
10/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 18, 2013, to file and serve the reply brief.13-32586
11/19/2013BriefFiled Reply Brief.13-34770
11/19/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix Vol IV - Missing Pages 783-786.14-06081
04/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, June 4, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes.14-13082
05/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-16373
06/04/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/11/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. Cherry, J., with whom Saitta, J., agrees, dissenting. Gibbons, J., dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. EN BANC15-17763
07/06/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-20369
07/06/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/21/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 15, 2015.15-20369