Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58740
Short Caption:JACOBS VS. ADELSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58294, 59265, 62489, 62944, 63444, 67576, 68265, 68275, 68309, 69090, 69802
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A627691Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:District Judge Montero for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/18/2011 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/09/2013 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/09/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
07/07/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.11-20219
07/07/2011OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Morris Peterson.
07/07/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.11-20223
07/11/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Campbell & Williams - check no. 19228.
07/13/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.11-20930
07/18/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.11-21459
07/20/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.11-21873
07/20/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge of Docketing Statement.11-21875
07/20/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement on Settement Judge.11-21933
08/02/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.11-23270
08/04/2011Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.11-23444
08/05/2011Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript.11-23673
11/01/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.11-33697
11/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due December 2, 2011.11-33699
11/02/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Copy of Substitution of Counsel filed in district court on 09/28/2011.11-33773
11/03/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Substitution of Counsel. Pisanelli Bice, PLLC in place and stead of Donald J. Campbell, Esq. and J. Colby Willimas, Esq. of the law firm of Campbell & Williams.11-33963
11/29/2011MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time For Appellant To File Opening Brief And Respondent To File Answering Brief.11-36662
12/19/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 1.11-38887
12/19/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 2.11-38890
12/19/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 3.11-38904
01/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief provisionally received in this court on December 19, 2011, and respondents shall have until January 30, 2012, to file and serve their answering briefs.12-01636
01/17/2012BriefFiled Steven Jacobs' Opening Brief.12-01637
01/20/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Index to Joint Appendix Vol. 1.12-02058
01/31/2012BriefFiled Respondent Sheldon Adelson's Answering Brief.12-03268
01/31/2012AppendixFiled Supplement to Joint Appendix, Vol. 4.12-03269
01/31/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Sheldon Adelson's Nev. R. App. P. 26.1 Disclosure Statement.12-03270
03/02/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name.12-06846
03/06/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time To File Reply Brief.12-07223
03/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on March 6, 2012.12-07982
03/13/2012BriefFiled Steven C. Jacobs' Reply Brief.12-07983
03/13/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 11 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction as to respondents Las Vegas Sands and Sands China. Respondents may file any reply within five days of the date that appellant's response is served.12-40135
12/31/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.12-41184
02/04/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Part. We dismiss this appeal with regard to Las Vegas Sands and Sands China and the appeal may therefore proceed as between Jacobs and Adelson. Fn2[The clerk of this court is directed to modify the caption of this matter by removing Las Vegas Sands and Sands China as respondents.]13-03583
08/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.13-23558
08/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Amended Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar.13-23754
08/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, October 9, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-25085
09/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice13-28451
10/04/2013Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Larry Ish of KTNV-13 Action News requesting permission for photographic or electronic coverage of oral arguments (via fax). Nos. 58740/62489.13-29666
10/04/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Larry Ish of KTNV-13 Action News is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m.13-29680
10/04/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice (KSNV Channel 3 in Las Vegas would like to Video Record the Oral Argument on 10/09/13 @ 10:30 am).13-29727
10/04/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Ms. Joyce Kotnik-Klevins shall coordinate with Larry Ish of KTNV 13 Action News, who was previously designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 am.13-29747
10/08/2013BriefFiled Sheldon Adelson's Supplemental Authority Submitted Under Nev. R. App. P.31(e).13-30023
10/09/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/04/2014Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. The Hon. Michael Montero is appointed to sit in the place of Justice Kristina Pickering.14-07035
05/16/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel, James J. Pisanelli, Esq., Todd L. Bice, Esq., Debra L. Spinelli, Esq., and Eric T. Aldrian, Esq. of the law firm Pisanelli Bice PLLC, on Behalf of Appellant Steven C. Jacobs.14-16013
05/30/2014Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta/Montero. Cherry, J., Gibbons, C.J., Parraguirre, J., dissenting. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. EN BANC14-17508
06/17/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.14-19975
06/17/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Steve L. Morris
06/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.14-20312
07/07/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.14-22033
07/22/2014MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to File a Reply In Support of Petition for Rehearing. (DETACHED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REHEARING AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 7/25/14).14-23686
07/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply from respondent's July 22, 2014, motion, and file the reply.14-24286
07/25/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing (Respondent's Reply in Support of Petition for Rehearing).14-24292
07/28/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Request to Strike or Alternatively, to Correct Record.14-24538
07/28/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Temporarily File Under Seal Exhibits to Motion for Leave to File Request to Strike or Alternatively, to Correct Record.14-24535
08/01/2014MotionFiled Response to Motion -Respondent's Consolidated Opposition to Appellant Jacobs's (1) Motion for Leave to File Request to Strike or Alternatively, to Correct Record; (2) Motion to Temporarily File under Seal Exhibits to Motion for Leave to File Request to Strike or Alternatively to Correct Record and Respondent's Countermotion to Strike.14-25232
08/07/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn2[The Honorable Michael Montero, District Judge in the Sixth Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in the place of the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, who voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Cherry, J., with whom, Gibbons, C.J., and Parraguirre, J., agrees dissenting.14-25930
08/07/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of (1) Motion for Leave to File Request to Strike or Alternatively, to Correct Record; (2) Motion to Temporarily File Under Seal Exhibits and Opposition to Countermotion.14-25940
08/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. In light of the order denying rehearing in this matter, all pending motions and requests for relief are denied as moot. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the documents received in this court on July 31, 2014.14-26083
09/02/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-28899
09/02/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/15/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 9, 2014.14-28899