Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58881
Short Caption:JOSHLIN (PIERRE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):49947, 50052, 62241, 66844, 77751
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228460Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2012How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/27/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)11-22663
08/01/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 20, 2011 Court Reporter: Rene Benson. Filed in district court on: July 26, 2011.11-23034
08/23/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.11-25611
09/01/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.11-26742
11/02/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Brief in Excess of 30 Pages and An Appendix in Excess of 250 Pages.11-33796
11/15/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on November 2, 2011. Respondent: Answering Brief due: 30 days. Fn1[We note that appellant's motion also seeks leave to file an appendix in excess of 250 pages. Because the appendix complies with the page limit, the motion is denied as moot. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix received on November 4, 2011.]11-35163
11/15/2011BriefFiled Opening Brief.11-35167
11/15/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volumes 1 through 5.11-35169
11/16/2011AppendixFiled CD-ROM for Appendix to Opening Brief. Filed on 11/15/2011.
12/15/2011BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.11-38680
12/15/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.11-38681
01/18/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-01767
01/18/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected certificate of compliance due: 10 days.12-01771
01/18/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
01/23/2012MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief in Excess of Pages Authorized by ADKT 0467.12-02377
01/25/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on January 23, 2012. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision on the briefs.12-02689
01/25/2012BriefFiled Reply Brief.12-02691
02/13/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP13-JH/RP/MC13-04622
03/11/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-07207
03/11/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/27/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 19, 2013.13-07207