Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58896
Short Caption:RIMER (COLLEEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/29/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal
07/29/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)11-22926
07/29/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days11-22930
08/01/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: February 14, 2011 to March 1, 2011. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 07/27/2011.11-22975
08/01/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.11-22976
08/10/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Judgment of Conviction filed on or about August 8, 2011.11-24238
09/01/2011Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on August 8, 2011. Response to Supreme Court Notice dated 08/10/11.11-26783
09/14/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days.11-27900
10/19/2011MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Fast Track Statement and Appendix.11-32390
11/01/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days.11-33526
11/17/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/04/10, 2/10/11, 3/03/11, 5/31/11, 2/14/11, 2/15/11, 2/16/11, 2/17/11, 2/18/11, 2/22/11, 2/23/11, 2/24/11, 2/28/11, and 3/01/11. (2/25/11 was requested but the jury was still deliberating and had not yet reached a verdict; there was nothing heard outside the presence on the record for that day).11-35592
01/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days.12-01667
01/30/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-03089
02/14/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Ms. Howard: 15 days to verify and inform this court whether the transcript for the proceedings conducted on February 23, 2011, has been filed in district court.12-04935
02/23/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The conditional sanction has been vacated. Fast track statement and appendix due: 30 days.12-05765
02/27/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Response from Sharon Howard that Transcript for February 23, 2011 is in Odyssey and available but she is unable to provide a copy due to cut-backs in the district court.12-06118
05/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Apear and Show Cause. Mr. Sanft shall personally appear before this court on June 13, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas, and show cause why additional sanctions, including but not limited to, monetary sanctions, removal as counsel in this appeal, referral to the State Bar for investigation, and/or prohibition from practicing before this court, should not be considered. Any evidence which Mr. Sanft desires to present on his behalf shall be filed in affidavit form on or before June 8, 2012.12-15077
06/20/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Sanft shall have until June 26, 2012, to file the fast track statement and appendix.12-19386
06/20/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.12-19446
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 1.12-21544
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 2.12-21545
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 3.12-21546
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 4.12-21547
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 5.12-21548
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 6.12-21549
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 7.12-21550
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 8.12-21551
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 9.12-21552
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 10.12-21553
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 11.12-21554
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 12.12-21555
07/10/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.12-21751
07/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 13, 2012, appellant's counsel, Michael Sanft, appeared before this court to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to file the fast track statement and appendix. Because Mr. Sanft has now complied with all orders of this court, we conclude that no further action is warranted in this matter.12-22789
07/31/2012Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed.
09/13/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP.12-28965
10/10/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur.12-32045
10/10/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
10/23/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 17, 2012.12-32045