Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 58904
Short Caption:MARTINORELLAN (ROGELIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68249
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C270002Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/08/2014 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Palo Verde High School
Submission Date:10/08/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/01/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)11-23046
08/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.11-23055
08/15/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 5, 2011; January 26, 2011; April 1, 2011; April 5 thru 8, 2011; April 11 thru 15, 2011 and June 17, 2011. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt; Renee Vincent; Michelle Ramsey and Angie Calvillo Filed in district court on: August 15, 2011.11-24730
08/25/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: April 1, 2011.11-25904
08/26/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/11.11-26167
09/12/2011MotionFiled Motion For Extension of Time Due to Two Missing Trans. (Fast Track Statement)11-27634
09/13/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: April 5 thru 8, 2011 and April 11 thru 15, 2011.11-27718
09/15/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 14, 2011. Court Recorders Schmidt and Calvillo: Certificate of Delivery due: 14 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.]11-28218
09/16/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/11.11-28262
09/21/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: June 17, 2011.11-28778
11/14/2011MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement.11-35057
11/22/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 9, 2012.11-36118
01/09/2012MotionFiled Motion for Two Week Extension to File Fast Track Statement.12-00776
01/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 23, 2012.12-01349
01/24/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Fast Track Statement and Appendix).12-02397
01/24/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/05/11, 4/06/11, 4/07/11, 4/08/11, 4/11/11, 4/12/11, 4/13/11, 4/14/11, and 4/15/11. Court Reporter: Angie Calvillo. Filed in district court on: 1/24/12.12-02512
01/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 23, 2012.12-02954
03/23/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-09374
03/26/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/05/11, 04/06/11, 04/07/11, 04/08/11, 04/11/11, 04/12/11, 04/13/11 & 04/14/11.12-09573
04/02/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: May 7, 2012.12-10217
05/08/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-14392
05/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 8, 2012.12-15141
05/29/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/15/11.12-16734
06/08/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement.12-18138
06/12/2012MotionFiled Motion for Full Briefing.12-18351
06/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. Because we grant the motion for full briefing, no action will be taken on appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement and appendix.12-18602
07/13/2012MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.12-22143
07/13/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due August 13, 2012.12-22145
08/13/2012MotionFiled Motion for One Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.12-25390
08/15/2012MotionFiled Motion to Transmit Exhibit.12-25607
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1.12-25611
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2.12-25612
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3.12-25613
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4.12-25615
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5.12-25616
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6.12-25619
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7.12-25620
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 8.12-25621
08/15/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 9.12-25622
08/16/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on August 15, 2012. Respondent: Answering Brief due: 30 days.12-25811
08/16/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-25812
08/28/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Exhibit. The district court clerk shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court a certified copy of the exhibit marked as Court's Exhibit A.12-27289
09/07/2012ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Exhibit: Courts Exhibit A (CD).
09/17/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.12-29262
09/17/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: October 17, 2012.12-29264
10/17/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.12-32985
10/18/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering brief due: November 16, 2012.12-33101
11/09/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.12-35536
11/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondent's Answering Brief.12-35593
12/10/2012MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief (30 days).12-38707
12/10/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: January 9, 2013.12-38740
01/09/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time. (Reply Brief-January 23, 2013)13-00998
01/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due: January 23, 2013.13-01232
01/24/2013MotionFiled Motion for Two Day Extension to File Reply Brief.13-02484
01/28/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type- Volume Limitation.13-02800
02/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief and appendix received via E-Flex.13-03409
02/01/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-03410
02/01/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief -Appendix Vol X.13-03411
02/01/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/25/2013OtherReceived page 1047 of ROA, Vol. 8. (Missing from original transmission.)13-08771
04/24/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on the next available calendar.13-11987
04/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Thursday, June 13, 2013, @ 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-12005
05/28/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-15624
06/13/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. MG/MD/NS.
09/26/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS.13-28818
10/14/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.13-30544
10/22/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing -Appellant (original submission was missing page 5).13-31746
11/21/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).13-35201
12/03/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.13-36201
04/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. Any Reply due from appellant: 15 days from service of answer.14-10817
04/10/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reconsideration Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.14-11605
04/25/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.14-13388
07/01/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. No supplemental briefing shall be filed.14-21434
08/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argumentt. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, October 8, 2014, at 10:00 am in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-28376
09/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-31551
10/08/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Request from Ken Ritter with Associated Press requesting permission to photograph the court during oral argument.14-33369
10/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Ken Ritter with the Associated Press is seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearings to be held October 8, 2014, at Palo Verde High School. Permission is granted. Ken Ritter of the Associated Press is designated as pool coordinator. Nos. 62585/5890414-33372
10/08/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/10/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Asking Court to Reconsider and Amend Previous Order and Allow Appellant Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (Supplemental Brief Attached)14-33793
11/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion asking this court to reconsider a prior order and grant appellant leave to file a supplemental brief. The motion is denied.14-36856
02/26/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Judgment affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Gibbons/Pickering. Saitta, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6.15-06128
03/13/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated March 12, 2015) Nos. 60478/63311/61193/62606/63787/61946/62107/65122/58904/59815. (Letter entered in 60478 as document no. 15-07810.)
03/23/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Exhibit: Courts Exhibit A (CD) returned this day.15-08797
03/23/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/03/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 30, 2015.15-08797