The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0464
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SCR 214, SCR 98 AND SCR 121.1 (TRANSITIONING INTO PRACTICE)Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:08/22/2011Public Hearing:10/03/2011 at 3:00 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
10/09/2013 at 3:00 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2011Administrative CaseFiled Petition.11-25387
09/14/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. (Exhibit A attached.) Hearing scheduled for Monday, October 3, 2011, at 3:00 p.m., in RJC, Las Vegas. Participation and written comments invited. Original and 8 copies no later than September 29, 2011.11-28007
10/03/2011Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/16/2011Administrative CaseFiled Order Establishing Pilot Program for the Transitioning Into Practice (TIP) Program for Newly-Admitted Attorneys. The requirement in SCR 215(1)(a) is suspended for one year. During that period, newly-admitted attorneys must complete the TIP program and permanent amendments shall be considered after completion of the pilot program. The Board of Governors shall file a report with this court no later than October 31, 2012. EN BANC11-35302
01/30/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.12-03078
02/27/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.12-06179
03/06/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing attorneys to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.12-07176
03/28/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.12-09805
04/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing attorneys to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.12-10466
07/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.12-21564
07/10/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing attorneys to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.12-21575
11/16/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition.12-36473
12/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order the Transitioning Into Practice mentorship pilot program is extended to November 30, 2013.12-38293
12/10/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.12-38794
12/20/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing attorneys to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.12-40253
08/13/2013Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.13-23758
08/14/2013Administrative CaseFiled Report to the Court and Request to Permanently Establish the Transitioning into Practice Program.13-23837
08/28/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.13-25528
08/28/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing scheduled for Wednesday, October 9, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., in RJC, Las Vegas. Participation and written comments invited. Original and 8 copies no later than October 4, 2013.13-25543
10/09/2013Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
01/13/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Comments from State Bar of Nevada.14-01254
02/11/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 98, 121.1 and 214 (Exhibit A attached). Effective 30 days from the date of this order. EN BANC14-04334
02/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.14-06247
02/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing attorneys to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.14-06258
07/17/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.14-23291
07/31/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program.14-24977
08/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Individual to serve as mentor in the TIP Program. (Wendy Krincek)14-27057
12/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint TIP mentors.14-42039
01/09/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (12 individuals)15-00923
02/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint TIP mentors.15-05790
02/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (8 individuals)15-05791
07/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint TIP mentors.15-21870
07/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (11 individuals)15-22381
02/02/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.16-03534
02/05/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. Appointing Individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (17 individuals)16-03953
07/21/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.16-22710
08/16/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing individuals to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (15 individuals.)16-25507
01/30/2017Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.17-03299
02/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order. Individuals are appointed to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (19 individuals)17-06770
07/20/2017Administrative CaseFiled Petition to appoint mentors.17-24144
07/25/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order. Individuals are appointed to serve as mentors in the TIP Program. (19 individuals)17-24686