Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59063
Short Caption:MONTAGE MARKETING, LLC VS. WASHOE COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 11OC00063IBClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Chief Justice Pickering<br/>Justice Cherry for Justice SaittaPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/31/2011 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/15/2013How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/24/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)11-25786
08/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.11-25788
08/26/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Maupin, Cox & Legoy - check no. 95386.
08/31/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg.11-26586
09/12/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted or is continued because: Had conference call on 9/9/11; more information needed; another conference call schedule for 10/5/11 at 10:00 a.m.11-27635
09/21/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.11-28803
09/21/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.11-28851
10/07/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Settlement Conference Date:11-30809
10/10/2011Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.11-31007
11/02/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.11-33742
11/07/2011Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.11-34204
01/04/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-00280
01/04/2012AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3.12-00374
02/01/2012MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Answering Brief).12-03481
02/01/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due Date: Febrauary 17, 2012.12-03486
02/17/2012BriefFiled Washoe County's Answering Brief.12-05296
03/22/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-09241
03/22/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/31/2012Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure of Appellant.12-17146
05/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument.13-14402
05/15/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/20/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Responsible Attorney (Herbert B. Kaplan, Deputy District Attorney in place and stead of David Creekman, Chief Deputy District Attorney).13-28054
09/25/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.13-28554
01/22/2015MotionFiled Request for Oral Argument (Rick Hsu).15-02334
01/27/2015MotionFiled Washoe County's Response to Request for Oral Argument.15-02949
05/31/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn3[Montage's motion for oral argument is denied.] Before: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39.18-20689
06/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-24086
06/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2018.18-24086