The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59147
Short Caption:LOBATO (KIRSTIN) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Related Case(s):49087, 58913
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177394Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/07/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)11-27210
10/03/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 5 days from the date that appellants' response is served. The deadlines for filing a transcript request form, docketing statement, and briefs shall be suspended pending further order of this court.11-30087
10/24/2011MotionFiled Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause.11-32850
10/27/2011MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause.11-33292
01/12/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED."12-01261
02/07/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur.12-04074
02/07/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
02/17/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2012.12-04074