The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59392
Short Caption:CARTER (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Related Case(s):64649
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C210000Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/14/2012 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/14/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/11/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)11-31239
11/02/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.11-33808
11/07/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.11-34220
11/10/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.11-34839
11/15/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 29, 2005; August 30, 2005; October 5, 2005; October 12, 2005; November 10, 2005; December 20, 2005; July 24, 2005; August 24, 2006; January 10, 2007; January 13, 2007; April 20, 2007; May 8, 2007; July 25, 2007; August 15, 2007; August 22, 2007; September 12, 2007; September 17, 18 & 19, 2007 and November 14, 2007; To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook.11-35177
02/07/2012MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule.12-04089
02/07/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due March 9, 2012.12-04091
03/08/2012AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1.12-07597
03/08/2012AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2.12-07600
03/08/2012AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 3.12-07603
03/09/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-07658
04/09/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.12-11185
05/09/2012MotionFiled Request for Transmission of Photographs.12-14700
05/09/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-14739
05/09/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/21/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion asking this court to direct the district court to transmit exhibits. We will take no action on the motion. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended motion or to file and serve a supplemental appendix.12-16018
05/21/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.12-16059
05/21/2012Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
06/06/2012AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Vol 4 (part 1).12-17675
06/06/2012AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Vol 4 (part 2).12-17678
06/14/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4: 00565-00691).12-18677
10/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel on the next available argument calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-32287
10/12/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, November 14, 2012, @ 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.12-32540
10/31/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.12-34345
11/06/2012BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities.12-35103
11/06/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Notice of Supplemental Authorities.12-35169
11/09/2012MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition or, in the Alternative, Notice of Supplemental Authorities.12-35478
11/14/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP12- NS/KP/JH
01/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Attorney Karen A. Connolly.13-00904
04/25/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." fn1-[We deny respondent's motion to strike appellant's notice of supplemental authorities.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/ Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26.13-12096
04/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Modifying Opinion. We have determined that the opinion requires modification. First, "Stefany Miley" on the first page of the opinion shall be replaced with "Sally Loehrer." Second, the following footnote shall be inserted: "While Senior District Judge Sally Loehrer presided over Carter's trial and sentencing and entered the judgment of conviction in this matter, District Judge Donald M. Mosley heard and decided Carter's suppression motion." This footnote shall be numbered footnote 2 and inserted immediately after the second sentence in the third paragraph of the "Facts and Procedural History" section of the opinion, which reads: "The district court conducted an evidentiary hearing." Finally, the next footnote, which was numbered footnote 2, shall be renumbered as footnote 3. Cause appearing, we direct the clerk of this court to modify the opinion filed on April 25, 2013, as set forth above.13-12322
05/14/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petition for Rehearing due: May 20, 2013.13-14151
05/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Court Regarding Petition for Rehearing.13-14443
05/20/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-14817
05/20/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/31/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court on May 24, 2013.13-14817