The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59396
Short Caption:IN RE: ANA J. FOX (NRAP 5)Classification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONECase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/28/2012How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
10/12/2011Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying a Question to the Supreme Court of Nevada. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth District and the Honorable Linda B. Riegle, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (DETACHED OPENING BRIEF AND EXCERPTS OF RECORD AND FILED PER ORDER 8/1/12)11-31307
01/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel for Respondent. Respondent: 11 days to file and serve her response to this order. Fn1[The filing fee for this matter is waived, and thus, no filing fee is due.].12-02960
04/03/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Inviting Participation of The Family Law Section of The State Bar as Amicus Curiae. The court invites the Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada to participate in this appeal as amicus curiae. Appellant is therefore directed to serve the BAP's certification order, along with the opening brief and excerpts of record transmitted with that order, on the Family Law Section within 15 days of this order's date. Thereafter, the Family Law Section shall have 30 days from the date of appellant's service of these materials to inform this court whether it intends to participate as amicus curiae in the proceedings before this court regarding this certified question.12-10602
04/13/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellant's Opening Brief; Excerpts of Record; Order Certifying a Question to the Supreme Court of Nevada and Order Inviting Participation of the Family Law Section of the State Bar as Amicus Cuirae.12-11947
05/07/2012Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Letter in response to orders filed 1/27/12 and 4/03/12. (FILED PER ORDER 8/1/12)
06/29/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Robert Cerceo, Esq. Chair, Family Law Section, State Bar of Nevada declining Participation as an Amicus Curiae.12-20580
07/02/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Authority.12-20828
08/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Question and Directing Briefing. We direct the clerk of this court to detach from the certification order, and file, the opening brief and excerpts of record. Appellant: Opening Brief due: 60 days. Because respondent is proceeding in proper person and has not requested leave to file briefs in proper person under NRAP 46(b), this matter shall stand submitted upon the filing of the opening brief. Fn1[The clerk of this court is directed to file proper person respondent's May 7, 2012, letter. Having reviewed this letter, we conclude that no action is required by this document.]12-24200
08/01/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief and Excerpts of Record. (Filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 2/15/11.)12-24204
08/01/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter. Letter in response to orders filed 1/27/12 and 4/03/12.12-14290
08/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Inviting Participation of the Bankruptcy Law Section of the State Bar as Amicus Curiae. Appellant: 15 days to serve the BAP's certification order, along with the opening brief and excerpts of record transmitted with that order, on the Bankruptcy Law Section of the State Bar. Bankruptcy Law Section: 30 days to inform this court whether it intends to participate as amicus curiae.12-24235
09/11/2012MotionFiled Response of Bankruptcy Law Section of State Bar of Nevada to Order Inviting Participation of the Bankruptcy Section of the State Bar as Amicus Curiae.12-28693
09/21/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Brief of Amicus Curiae. The Bankruptcy Law Section shall have 11 days to properly serve their response to the court's August 1, 2012, order on appellant and respondent. Appellant and respondent shall have 11 days to file any response to the Bankruptcy Law Section's request that it be granted 90 days, or until December 10, 2012, to file and serve its amicus brief. Fn1[We conclude that no action is needed with regard to the June 29, 2012, letter submitted by the Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada.]12-30031
09/26/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service Re: Response of Bankuptcy Law Section of State Bar of Nevada to Order Inviting Participation of the Bankruptcy Section of the State Bar as Amicus Curiae.12-30426
09/28/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-30822
09/28/2012Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
10/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Bankruptcy Law Section's Amicus Curiae Brief. The Bankruptcy Law Section shall have until December 10, 2012, to file its amicus brief.12-33223
12/11/2012BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae, The Bankruptcy Law Secion of the State Bar of Nevada.12-38856
12/28/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Response to Amicus Brief of the Bankrupcty Law Section. (DETACHED RESPONSIVE BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER 2/4/13)12-41110
02/04/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Response to Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court shall detach and file appellant's responsive brief, which is attached as exhibit A to the December 28, 2012, motion for leave to file that document.13-03578
02/04/2013BriefFiled Trustee's Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae, The Bankruptcy Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada.13-03579
05/30/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question answered." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39.13-15875
06/24/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur13-18442
06/24/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed