The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59554
Short Caption:FALCONI VS. SECRETARY OF STATEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Related Case(s):56169, 64331
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0903089Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/02/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Alexander M. Falconi check no. 222.
11/02/2011Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus.11-33790
11/02/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.11-33791
11/02/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Expedited Review.11-33795
11/08/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (Nevada Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto and Solicitor General C. Wayne Howle give notice of appearance as attorneys for Respondent Ross Miller, Nevada Secretary of State).11-34315
11/09/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Phone Number and Proof of Service of Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Motion for Expedited Review and Appendix of Exhibits.11-34676
11/28/2011Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice of Respondent's Non-Opposition. (FILED PER 2/01/12 ORDER).
12/28/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Responses and Answer. We direct both petitioner and respondent to file, within 11 days from the date of this order, a response. Respondent: Answer to Petition due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of respondent's answer to file any reply to the answer. We will expedite our consideration of this writ petiton.11-39862
01/06/2012MotionReceived Proper Person Response. Response Regarding Third-Party. (In response to order filed 12/28/10). (FILED PER 2/01/12 ORDER).
01/09/2012MotionFiled Secretary of State's Supplemental Response.12-00841
01/27/2012Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answer to Writ Petition due: February 3, 2012.12-03064
02/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Briefing. Secretary of State: 5 days to serve petitioner's writ petition, and the entire accompanying record, including every order filed by this court in this matter, upon the third-party recipient. Third-party recipient of the fictitious address: 20 days from the date of the respondent's service to file in this court any notice of intent to participate in these proceedings. Fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file the documents provisionally received from petitioner on November 28, 2011, and January 6, 2012.].12-03553
02/01/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Notice of Respondent's Non-Opposition.11-36421
02/01/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Response. Response Regarding Third-Party.12-00609
02/03/2012Petition/WritFiled Secretary of State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-03744
02/03/2012ExhibitFiled Exhibits to Secretary of State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-03745
02/06/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Documents Listed in Exhibit A on Monica Farrar by mailing to her fictitious address of 303 South Roop Street, Carson City, NV 89701.12-03910
02/06/2012ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibit A which was served on Monica Farrar by mailing to her fictitious address of 303 South Roop Street, Carson City, NV 89701.12-03911
02/13/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Documents Listed in Exhibit A on Monica Farrar by mailing to her fictitious address of PO Box 2743, Carson City, NV 89702-2743.12-04693
02/13/2012ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibit A served on Monica Farrar by mailing to her fictitious address of PO Box 2743, Carson City, NV 89702-2743.12-04695
02/15/2012Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply to Secretary's Answer To Petition For Writ of Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER OF 4/19/13).
02/15/2012Notice/IncomingReceived Notice of Monica Ann Farrar's Preferred Mailing Address. (FILED PER ORDER OF 4/19/13).
02/17/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Documents to Monica Farrar Per Court's Order.12-05226
02/23/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to Particpate.12-05882
03/22/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Participation of Third-Party Recipient Monica Ann Farrar in this Original Writ Proceeding. Farrar shall be added as a real party in interest and the clerk is directed to modify the caption to conform with the caption on this order. Farrar shall have 30 days to file and serve an answer to Falconi's petition. Falconi and respondent Secretary of State shall have 15 days from service of Farrar's answer to file and serve any reply.12-09179
04/23/2012Petition/WritFiled Monica Ann FArrar's Response to Alexander Falconi Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-12809
04/23/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service by Facsimile and U.S Mail or Monica Ann Farrar's Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-12832
04/24/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Verification of Monica Ann Farrar.12-13001
05/04/2012Petition/WritReceived Reply to Farrar's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER OF 4/19/13).
08/29/2012Notice/IncomingReceived Supplementary Example to Reply to Farrar's Response.(FILED PER ORDER OF 4/19/13).
11/13/2012Notice/IncomingReceived Notice of Change of Address of Petitioner, Alexander M. Falconi. (FILED PER ORDER OF 4/19/13).
04/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Court Clerk to File Received Documents. We direct the clerk of this court to file petitioner's reply to respondent's answer to the writ petition and notice regarding real party in interest's preferred mailing address, provisionally received in this court on February 15, 2012; reply to real party in interest's answer to the writ petition, provisionally received on May 4, 2012; supplementary example, provisionally received on August 29, 2012; and notice of change of address, provisionally received on November 13, 2012.13-11603
04/19/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Secretary's Answer To Petition For Writ of Mandamus.12-05026
04/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Notice of Monica Ann Farrar's Preferred Mailing Address.12-05028
04/19/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Farrar's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-14073
04/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Supplementary Example to Reply to Farrar's Response.12-27413
04/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Petitioner, Alexander M. Falconi.12-35841
04/25/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before Hardesty, Parraguirre and Cherry, JJ. Author: Cherry, J. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP1313-12098
05/08/2013MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Make Minor Amendment to Opinion. (FILED PER ORDER OF 6/13/13).
06/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Amend Opinion. As the sentence was accurate and consistent with the remainder of the opinion, we deny the motion to amend. Fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file petitioner's motion for an amendment, which was provisionally received on May 8, 2013.]13-17430
06/13/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Make Minor Amendment to Opinion.13-17433
06/13/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur13-17436
06/13/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
01/07/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Entry of order from proper person petitioner Falconi.14-00426