Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59687
Short Caption:LAND BARON INVESTMENTS, INC. VS. BONNIE SPRINGS FAMILY LPCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):56947, 71734
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A564723Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/21/2011 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:07/10/2013 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:07/10/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/18/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/18/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)11-35619
11/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.11-35622
11/21/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld.11-35930
11/21/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from John H. Cotton and Associates, Ltd. Check no. 7042.
12/01/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 12, 2012.11-36874
12/05/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.11-37201
12/05/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals).11-37207
12/06/2011Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement.11-37245
12/06/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Amended Docketing Statement).11-37249
12/07/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Docketing Statement Civil Appeals on Settlement Judge.11-37513
12/07/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals on Settlement Judge.11-37514
01/05/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.12-00483
01/09/2012Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 7071 returned to John H. Cotton and Associates Ltd.
01/18/2012Docketing StatementFiled Supplement to Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-01878
05/07/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.12-14244
05/11/2012Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.12-15013
05/15/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 6, 2009. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook.12-15480
05/15/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 29, 2010; April 21, 2010; July 21, 2010; November 17, 2010; March 15, 2011 and March 28, 2011 thru April 6, 2011. To Court Reporter: Brenda Schroeder.12-15481
05/15/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 5, 2011. To Court Reporter: Loree Murray.12-15482
07/10/2012BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.12-21691
07/13/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes 1-40.12-22961
07/23/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of Appellants Pursuant to NRAP 29 and to Extend time in Which to File.12-23059
07/30/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of Appellants pursuant to NRAP 29 and to Extend Time in Which to File.12-23980
08/01/2012MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Prudential Americana Group's Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae.12-24194
08/02/2012MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Appellants' Reply Brief.12-24357
08/02/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: September 9, 2012. Reply Brief due: November 8, 2012.12-24363
08/31/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to file Prudential Americana Group's proposed amicus brief, which was provisionally received in this court on July 30, 2012.12-27725
08/31/2012BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Prudential Americana Group Supporting Appellants.12-24023
09/11/2012BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.12-28597
11/07/2012BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.12-35192
11/07/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel on the next available calendar.13-15737
06/17/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, July 10, 2013, @ 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-17738
06/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-18739
07/10/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP13-JH/RP/MC.
09/17/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before Hardesty, CJ, Parraguirre and Cherry, JJ. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. NNP13.15-28163
10/02/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing.15-29971
10/02/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John H. Cotton.
10/29/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.15-33050
11/12/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Response to Petition for Rehearing.15-34534
11/24/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-35999
12/04/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition For An En Banc Reconsideration.15-37011
01/22/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-02283
02/17/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-05085
02/17/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 24, 2016.16-05085