The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59703
Short Caption:WATTERS (FRANKIE) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C272483Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/21/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/21/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)11-35895
11/29/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle L. Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/29/11 and 8/05/11.11-36540
12/19/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cheryl Carpenter stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: August 8, 2011; August 9, 2011 and October 11, 2011.11-38946
12/27/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/16/11 and 5/25/11.11-39769
01/03/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Statement12-00198
01/12/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 17, 2012, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.12-01152
02/17/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appendix Vol I.12-05313
02/17/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appendix Vol II - part 1.12-05314
02/17/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appendix Vol III Part 1.12-05315
02/17/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.12-05323
03/08/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fast Track Response).12-07628
03/12/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Fast Track Response due: March 28, 2012.12-07913
03/28/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.12-09737
04/11/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.12-11666
05/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibit. District Court: Exhibit due: 20 days.13-13968
05/23/2013ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Exhibit: Original Court's Exhibits.
11/27/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, C.J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Douglas/Saitta/Hardesty/Cherry. Parraguirre, J., concurring. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 94. EN BANC13-35858
12/23/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-38952
12/23/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
01/09/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 30, 2013.13-38952