Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59815
Short Caption:ZAHAVI (HAREL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C269710Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/10/2013 at 10:15 AMOral Argument Location:Reno High School
Submission Date:09/10/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/13/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)11-38087
12/15/2011Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 7556 returned to Wright, Stanish & Winckler.
12/19/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Filing of 2 File Stampled Copies of Rough Draft Transcript Request Form and Proof of Service Form.11-39012
01/06/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Fast Track Statement Due of January 23, 2012.12-00683
01/12/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 22, 2012.12-01145
02/23/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.12-05746
02/23/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 1.12-05747
02/23/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol 2.12-05749
02/23/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Trial Counsel Motion to Withdraw from Representation.12-05866
03/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. District court order: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. Fn1[The granting of this motion is, of course, conditioned upon trial counsel's full cooperation with appellate counsel during the pendency of this appeal].12-06695
03/29/2012Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed copy of minute order filed in district court on 3/27/2012 appointing Matthew Lay as counsel for appellant.12-09906
03/29/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Mr. Lay: Supplemental Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. Respondent: Fast Track Response due: 40 days.12-10005
04/12/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to File Supplement.12-11803
04/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 18, 2012, to file and serve a supplemental fast track statement.12-11877
06/18/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Supplement.12-19119
07/09/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response12-21337
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response Vol 1.12-21338
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response Vol 2.12-21339
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response Vol 3.12-21340
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response Vol 4.12-21341
07/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response Vol 5.12-21342
07/23/2012Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Reply.12-23122
07/23/2012Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
08/29/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief.12-27379
10/01/2012Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening brief due: October 5, 2012.12-30848
10/08/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-31568
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1.12-31569
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2.12-31618
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3.12-31617
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4.12-31619
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 5.12-31620
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 6.12-31621
10/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 7.12-31622
11/06/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.12-35079
12/07/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.12-38540
12/07/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 10, 2013, at 10:15 a.m. at Reno High School. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-23502
08/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-25282
09/06/2013Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from David Sandler of KRNV News 4 requesting permission for photograpic and video coverage of the oral arguments on September 10, 2013 (via fax). Nos. 57749/59815.13-26426
09/09/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Permission for Media Coverage. David Sandler of KRNV is designated pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the Reno High School gymnasium by 9: 30 a.m. Nos. 57749/59815.13-26434
09/09/2013Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Ed Vogel of the Las Vegas Review-Journal requesting permission for photographer Kevin Clifford to take pictures during 10:15 a.m. oral argument on Tuesday, Sept. 9, 2013, at Reno High School.13-26463
09/09/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Vogel shall coordinate with David Sandler KRNV News 4, who was previously designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the Reno High School gymnasium before 9:30 a.m.13-26619
09/10/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/26/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7.15-06129
03/13/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated March 12, 2015) Nos. 60478/63311/61193/62606/63787/61946/62107/65122/58904/59815. (Letter entered in 60478 as document no. 15-07810.)
03/23/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-08802
03/23/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/08/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 30, 2015.15-08802
06/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed May 27, 2015 and placed on the docket June 11, 2015 as Case No. 14-10175.15-18305
10/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.15-30885