The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60275
Short Caption:ROBBEN VS. STATE OF NEV., DEPT. OF TAXATIONClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Related Case(s):59273
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 11OC001661BCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/24/2012How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Todd Robben. (Cash)
02/23/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.)12-05741
02/27/2012BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.12-06068
02/27/2012Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Certificate of No Transcript Request.12-06069
03/26/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Report Illegally Backdated Court Filings by Respondent.12-09443
03/26/2012MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Report Respondent's Legal Counsel Ann Mcdermott to the Appropriate Authorities for Illegally Backdating Court Filings.12-09448
03/27/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days.12-09653
03/30/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries12-10083
04/10/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Report Counsel to the Authorities. Fn1[Since appellant's motion to report counsel to the authorities was already filed in this court, we deny appellant's motion for leave to file that motion.]12-11424
04/12/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Panel Reconsideration on April 10, 2012 Order Denying Appellant's Motion to Report Respondent's Legal Counsel Ann McDermott to the Appropriate Authorities for Illegally Backdating Court Filings.12-11737
04/24/2012Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vols 1 thru 7.
04/24/2012Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/07/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Panel Reconsideration of Order Denying Appellant's Motion to Report Respondent's Counsel to the Authorities.12-14306
06/29/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant Ex-Parte Motion to Order Briefing Schedule.12-20559
08/08/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Order a Briefing Schedule.12-24994
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant Notice of Change of Address.13-13934
05/15/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's denial of appellant's petition for judicial review." SNP13-MG/MD/NS13-14291
05/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court updated docket sheet.13-14679
05/31/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $150.00 from Todd Robben. (cash)
05/31/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (Motion for Rehearing)13-16105
07/24/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).13-21695
08/22/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-24788
08/22/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
08/27/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2013.13-24788