The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60371
Short Caption:ARMENTA-CARPIO (JAVIER) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C269718Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/14/2012How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/02/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/02/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (GRASSO)12-06778
03/02/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (DURHAM)12-06779
03/02/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Due Date: 10 days12-06781
03/05/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Confirmation as Counsel. (Benjamin C. Durham confirms as counsel for appellant Javier Armenta-Carpio).12-06998
03/07/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.12-07425
03/19/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 18, 2011; October 19, 2011 and October 20, 2011. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard.12-08592
04/06/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/11.12-11066
06/06/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 18, 2011; October 19, 2011; October 20, 2011 and January 10, 2012.12-17834
06/18/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.12-18989
07/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: August 31, 2012.12-22481
09/04/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vols 1 thru 3.12-27752
09/04/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-27813
10/04/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).12-31385
10/04/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Answering Brief due November 5, 2012.12-31387
11/02/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.12-34772
12/10/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief Filed.
12/14/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.12-39523
12/14/2012Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
07/25/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54.13-21920
08/19/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-24399
08/19/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to proper person appellant returning, unfiled, "Notice of Intent to File Rehearing."13-37744