The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60466
Short Caption:STATE VS. HAMILTON (NATHAN) C/W 60464Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Consolidated:60464*, 60466Related Case(s):60464
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276187Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/09/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/16/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/16/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal.12-08473
03/20/2012MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos 60464/60466.12-08844
03/22/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and Ordering Full Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Appellant: 120 days to file and serve the opening brief. Respondent: 30 days from the filing of the opening brief to file and serve their respective answering briefs. Fn1[Because counsel has already requested rough draft transcripts, counsel need not file certified transcripts in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. But should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). Nos. 60464/60466.12-09203
07/20/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (60 days). Nos. 60464/60466.12-22971
07/25/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 18. 2012. Nos. 60464/6046612-23390
09/17/2012BriefFiled Opening Brief Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 60464/60466.12-29267
09/17/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1. Nos. 60464/60466.12-29268
10/15/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos 60466/60464.12-32621
10/15/2012MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 60466/60464.12-32624
10/23/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answering brief due: December 17, 2012. Nos. 60464/60466.12-33654
12/18/2012BriefFiled Answering Brief.12-39965
12/18/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.12-39968
12/26/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae. Nos. 60464/60466.12-40690
12/31/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada: Motion for leave to file an amicus brief due: January 7, 2013. Nos. 60464/6046612-41194
01/08/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by the ACLU of Nevada and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attached is the Proposed Amicus Brief). Nos. 60464/60466.13-00658
01/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Attorneys for Proposed Amicus Curiae. Staci J. Pratt and Katrina M. Ross, ACLU of Nevada. Nos. 60464/60466.13-00870
01/10/2013MotionFiled Opposition for Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by the ACLU of Nevada. Nos. 60464/60466.13-01045
01/14/2013MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Nos. 60464/60466.13-01474
01/17/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Reply Brief).13-01984
01/17/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend time to file reply brief is approved. Due date: February 18, 2013. Nos. 60464/60466.13-01980
02/19/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 60464/60466.13-05035
02/19/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 60464/60466.
03/08/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing Amicus to File Brief that Complies with NRAP 32. The brief submitted with the motion does not comply with NRAP 32. The ACLU-NV shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amicus brief that complies with NRAP 32. The State shall have 15 days from service of the amicus brief to file and serve a response that does not exceed 5 pages, if deemed necessary. Nos. 60464/6046613-07152
03/18/2013MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Exceed the Page Limit for Brief of Amicus Curiae.13-08110
03/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief received on March 18, 2013. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response that does not exceed 5 pages, if deemed necessary. Nos. 60464/60466.13-08577
03/22/2013BriefFiled Amicus Brief -Brief of Amicus Curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union. Nos. 60464/60466.13-08579
04/01/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to Brief of Amicus Curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union. Nos. 60464/60466.13-09438
06/24/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant: 15 days to file and serve a supplemental brief. Respondents: 15 days to file and serve a response. The page/type volume limitations applicable to reply briefs under NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) (15 pages, 7000 words or 650 lines of text) shall apply. Nos. 60464/60466.13-18562
06/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Nos. 60464/60466.13-18768
07/08/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. Nos. 60464/60466.13-19755
07/24/2013BriefFiled Respondents' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 60464/60466.13-21909
07/24/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondents' Supplemental Brief.13-21910
07/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, September 9, 2013, @ 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 60464/60466.13-22180
08/13/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Gary A. Modafferi appearing on behalf of Respondent Hamilton). Nos. 60464/60466.13-23709
08/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. These consolidated cases are currently scheduled for oral argument on September 9, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel should be prepared specifically to address: (1) the impact, if any, of the 2013 amendments to NRS Chapter 453A on these appeals; (2) retroactive application of the amendments; (3) the permissibility of severing NRS 453A.300(1)(f); (4) whether the ordinary dictionary definition of "consideration" provides notice of what conduct is prohibited; and (5) whether "consideration" could be interpreted broadly to include labor or donations of tools and/or consumables such as gardening supplies, fertilizer, or water. Nos. 60464/60466.13-25160
08/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 60464/60466.13-25277
09/04/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney Julie Ray, Esq. in place and instead of the firm of Turco and Draskovich as well as Gary Modafferi, Esq. (of counsel of the firm of Turco and Draskovich)13-26147
09/06/2013MotionFiled Emergency to Allow Association of Counsel for Oral Argument on Direct Appeal. Nos . 60464/60466.13-26291
09/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Mr. Low shall be allowed to appear on behalf of respondent Leonard Schwingdorf. Ms. Raye shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Low in this matter. Nos. 60464/60466.13-26338
09/06/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Joseph H. Low, IV., Esq., appearing on behalf of Ms. Raye to assist and argue this matter on behalf of Respondent, Schwingdorf). Nos. 60464/60466.13-26342
09/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Death of Respondent, Nathan Hamilton.13-26459
09/09/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 60464/60466.
09/10/2013AppendixFiled Response to Order During Oral Argument to Supplement the Record.13-26652
01/24/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal (60466) and Reversing and Remanding (60464). "We dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 60466, and in Docket No. 60464, we reverse and remand the district court's judgment for proceedings consistent with this order." Nos. 60464/60466. EN BANC14-02489
02/20/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-05665
02/20/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 26, 2014.14-05665