Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60527
Short Caption:BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO. VS. WINDHAVEN & TOLLWAY, LLC C/W 59638Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:59638*, 60527Related Case(s):59638
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A617556Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:03/28/2012 / Gang, LeonardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/09/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
03/27/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-09662
03/27/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.12-09664
03/28/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang.12-09876
03/29/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart. Check no. 67004193.
04/02/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 30, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. Nos. 59638/60527.12-10338
04/19/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-12629
04/25/2012MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 60527/59638.12-13194
05/02/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 13, 2012. Nos. 59638/60527.12-13829
06/18/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 59638/60527.12-19063
10/10/2012Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/Briefing Reinstated/Denying Motion. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. We deny the Motion for En Banc Review. This denial is without prejudice to the parties' right to file such a motion after completion of briefing, if deemed appropriate at that time. Nos. 59638/60527.12-32154
10/23/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/12/11, 09/13/11 & 01/24/12. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent.12-33545
11/02/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: July 12, 2011; September 13, 2011 and January 24, 2012. Nos. 59638/60527.12-34769
11/08/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included.12-35359
11/09/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.12-35511
11/21/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Real Party In Interest, Branch Banking and Trust Company. Nos. 59638/6052712-37102
12/04/2012Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. All respondents represented by Bogatz & Associates, P.C., Answering brief due: December 17, 2012. Nos. 59638/6052712-38194
12/05/2012MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time to File Respondent Thomas B. Acevedo's Answering Brief.12-38249
12/07/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court shall file Nevada Banker's Association's amicus brief, which was provisionally received in this court on November 21, 2012. Nos. 59638/60527.12-38659
12/07/2012BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent, Branch Banking and Trust Company (Nevada Bankers Association). Nos. 59638/60527.12-38660
12/13/2012MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/6052712-39298
12/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulations for Extensions of Time. Respondents: Answering Briefs due: January 14, 2013. Nos. 59638/6052712-40170
01/15/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/60527. (Respondent represented by Charles M. Vlasic, III).13-01549
01/15/2013BriefFiled Respondent Thomas B. Acevedo's Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/60527.13-01564
01/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/6052713-01586
01/17/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Errata and Supplement to Thomas B. Acevedo's Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/60527.13-01895
02/20/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs. Nos. 59638/6052713-05379
03/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply briefs, provisionally received in this court on February 20, 2013. Nos. 59638/6052713-07931
03/15/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply To The Windhaven Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/6052713-07932
03/15/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to the Respondent Acevedo's Answering Brief. Nos. 59638/6052713-07933
03/15/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 59638/60527
03/18/2013MotionFiled Renewal Of Motion For En Banc Review. Nos. 59638/60527.13-08074
04/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for En Banc Reconsideration. The clerk of this court shall assign these appeals for consideration by the en banc court. Nos. 59638/6052713-11565
06/17/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Change of Firm Name and Firm Address. New name-Bogatz Law Group.13-17782
07/24/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Nos. 59638/60527.13-21701
08/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, October 9, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 59638/60527.13-25086
09/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice13-28452
10/09/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 59638/60527
07/01/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. Bogatz Law Group.14-21401
04/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. Gibbons, J., with whom Cherry and Saitta, JJ., join, dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. EN BANC Nos, 59638/6052715-13097
05/14/2015MotionFiled Motion For Extension Of Time To File Respondents' Petition For Rehearing. Nos. 59638/60527.15-14751
05/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents: Petition for Rehearing due: June 17, 2015. Nos. 59638/6052715-14917
06/18/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Petition For Rehearing. Nos. 59638/60527.15-18625
06/18/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Charles M. Vlasic, III.
06/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 59638/60527.15-18674
07/06/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 59638/60527.15-20452
07/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answer to petition for rehearing received on July 9, 2015. Nos. 59638/6057.15-21020
07/10/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled BB&T's Answer to Petitioners' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 59638/60527.15-21027
07/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 21, 2015) Nos. 63284/61059/64623/59638/60527/63076/63683/62792. (Letter entered in 63284 as document no. 15-22234)
07/23/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Gibbons, J., with whom Cherry and Saitta, J.J., joins, dissenting. Nos. 59638/6052715-22404
08/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 59638/60527.15-25042
08/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 59638/60527.
08/31/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 24, 2015.15-25042