Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60673
Short Caption:TALLMAN VS. DIST. CT. (CPS SECURITY (USA), INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A589249Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/08/2013 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:11/08/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2012Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Leon M. Greenberg.
04/17/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-12226
05/29/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.12-16757
07/25/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days from service of real parties in interest's answer to file and serve any reply.12-23360
08/17/2012MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time for Real Party in Interest to File Answer Against Issuance of Requested Write of Mandamus and For Petitioner to File Reply to that Answer.12-25954
08/24/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Carol Davis Zucker and Timothery W. Roehrs of Kamer, Zucker, Abbott appearing on behalf of Real Parties in Interest).12-26760
09/18/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Real parties in interest: Answer due: September 24, 2012. Petitoner shall then have until November 8, 2012, to file and serve any reply.12-29462
09/25/2012Petition/WritFiled Real Parties In Interest's Answering Brief To Petition For Writ of Mandamus.12-30198
09/25/2012AppendixFiled Real Parties In Interest's Appendix.12-30200
11/08/2012Petition/WritFiled Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-35441
01/18/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-02118
06/13/2013BriefFiled Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-17354
07/02/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority (Real Party In Interest).13-19353
07/11/2013BriefFiled Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-20307
08/23/2013BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-25071
09/20/2013BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-28132
09/26/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-28858
10/08/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, November 6, 2013, @ 10:00 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes.13-30131
10/15/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. This matter was previously scheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on Wednesday, November 6, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The time for argument is hereby changed, and oral argument before the en banc court will be held on Friday, November 8, 2013, at the hour of 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas.13-30859
10/16/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Notice. Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, November 8, 2013, @ 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes.13-31031
10/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-31770
10/22/2013BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-31828
11/05/2013BriefFiled Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority and Notice of Reliance Upon Supplemental Authority.13-33263
11/08/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Petitioners: 30 days to file and serve a supplemental brief. Real parties in interest: 15 days to file a response. The briefs shall comply with the page-length/type-volume limits on reply briefs. Petitioners may file and serve a reply of no more than five pages (or the corresponding type-volume limitations in NRAP 32) within ten days of the date that real parties in interest file and serve their response.13-37872
01/14/2014BriefFiled Supplemental Brief - Petitioner's Supplemental Briefing as Per the Court's Order of December 13, 2013.14-01366
01/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petitioner's Supplemental Briefing as Per the Court's Order of December 13, 2013.14-01367
01/30/2014BriefFiled Real Parties In Interest's Response To Petitioner's Supplemental Briefing Pursuant To The Court's Order Of December 13, 2013.14-03145
02/11/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Reply Supplemental Briefing as Per the Courts Order of December 13, 2013.14-04329
02/27/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-06454
06/25/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-20875
07/01/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Response to Real Party in Interests Notice of Supplemental Authorities.14-21527
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. EN BANC Nos. 60673/6139015-28852
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-31688
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)