Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60680
Short Caption:MCNAMARA (JAMES) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64403
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C277666Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2012Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/18/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Exhibits attached)12-12395
04/19/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days.12-12561
05/07/2012Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus.12-14157
05/07/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus.12-14160
05/16/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition Mandamus.12-15522
05/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court is directed to file petitioner's opposition received in May 16, 2012.12-15684
05/17/2012Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition.12-15685
09/27/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP12-NS/KP/JH.12-30564
10/22/2012RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur12-33380
10/22/2012Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed