Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 60944
Short Caption:WEDDELL VS. SHARP C/W 61329Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:60944*, 61329Related Case(s):61329, 61891, 64475, 69191
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1102940Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/01/2012 / Weise, CathySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/23/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District court.
05/25/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-16557
05/25/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.12-16559
05/31/2012Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.12-17105
05/31/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Day R. Williams, Esq. Check no. 4167.
06/01/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry.12-17241
06/13/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-18481
07/09/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 29th at 10:00 a.m.12-21488
09/04/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment - Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise.12-27839
10/05/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. Nos. 60944/61329.12-31498
10/30/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 60944/61329/61891.12-34247
12/31/2012Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 90 days opening brief and appendix. Fn2 [Upon completion of briefing, this appeal may be consolidated for purposes of disposition with the related appeals in Docket Nos. 61329 and 61891.]12-41220
03/14/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 1-5.13-07833
03/29/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-09384
04/01/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate Cases.13-09423
04/25/2013MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.13-12185
04/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: May 29, 2013.13-12189
05/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. These two appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 60944/6132913-14144
05/31/2013BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 60944/6132913-16077
06/25/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 60944/6132913-18718
06/25/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 60944/61329
08/28/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 60944/61329.13-25551
08/28/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/25/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of the Firm of Lipson, Neilson, Cole, Seltzer & Garin, P.C.13-28696
11/26/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Related Case. Nos. 60944/6132913-35658
02/24/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 60944/61329.14-05927
02/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, May 5, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 60944/61329.14-06545
04/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 60944/6132914-12823
04/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Oral Argument. These appeals shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order. Nos. 60944/61329.14-13051
04/23/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
06/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: 20 days. Respondent's Supplemental Brief due: 20 days from service of appellant's Supp. Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: 11 days from service of respondent's Supp. Brief. Nos. 60944/61329.14-20443
07/11/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief on Nonmutual Claim Preclusion. Nos. 60944/61329.14-22508
07/22/2014BriefFiled Supplemental Brief; Respondents' Brief on Nonmutual Claim Preclusion. Nos. 60944/6132914-23871
07/31/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 60944/61329.14-25020
08/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The supplemental reply shall be due by August 14, 2014. Nos. 60944/61329.14-25547
08/14/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief on Nonmutual Claim Preclusion. Nos 60944/61329.14-26702
05/28/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Gibbons. Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, J., agrees, dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. Nos. 60944/6132915-16229
06/16/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Rehearing. Nos. 60944/61329.15-18280
06/16/2015Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Day R. Williams. Check No. 5421. Nos. 60944/61329.
07/10/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service. (Appellant's Petition for En Banc Rehearing).15-21006
07/23/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, J., joins, dissenting. Nos. 60944/6132915-22408
08/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 60944/61329.15-25067
08/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 60944/61329.
08/25/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 21, 2015.15-25067
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)