Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61006
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58101, 73000, 74070, 74070-COA, 74859, 74859-COA, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492, 80493
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224572Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/14/2013How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-17799
06/26/2012Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.12-20029
06/26/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.12-20030
10/01/2012MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request).12-30923
10/02/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 3, 2012, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.12-31125
12/03/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request).12-37924
12/07/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: January 14, 2013.12-38574
01/14/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-01465
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1.13-01468
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2.13-01469
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3.13-01471
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5.13-01473
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 7.13-01475
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 8.13-01479
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 9.13-01480
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10.13-01481
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 11.13-01482
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 12.13-01486
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 13.13-01487
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 14.13-01488
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 15.13-01489
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 16.13-01491
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 17.13-01492
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 18.13-01493
01/14/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 19.13-01494
01/15/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4.13-01502
01/15/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 6.13-01503
02/13/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.13-04577
02/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 15, 2013.13-04597
03/14/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request. (Answering Brief)13-07742
03/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: April 15, 2013.13-07899
04/09/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-10346
04/09/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.13-10347
05/02/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-12878
05/02/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeals for Decision without Oral Argument.13-34331
11/14/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/18/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS13-38438
01/15/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-01564
01/15/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
01/24/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 17, 2014.14-01564