Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61103
Short Caption:TORRES VS. NEV. DIRECT INSURANCE CO. C/W 61640Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:61103*, 61640Related Case(s):61640, 71918
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A613714Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/08/2012 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/09/2014How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/21/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
06/21/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-19463
06/21/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.12-19465
06/22/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ganz & Hauf, Chartered. Check no. 10999.
07/09/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Salvatoe Gugino.12-21364
07/09/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-21527
08/01/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 4, 2012 at 9:00 a.m.12-24272
11/07/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Judge Gugino will not be able to preside over this matter and requests that it be reassigned to another settlement judge.12-35190
11/08/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment - Paul H. Schofield.12-35356
12/10/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/5/13. Nos. 61103/61640.12-38820
12/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to Appear for Mandatory Settlement Conference. February 5, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. Nos. 61103/61640.12-38821
02/08/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 61103/61640.13-04165
02/19/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 61103/61640.13-05082
03/06/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/05/12 & 04/05/12. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton.13-06824
03/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why the appeal In Docket No. 61640 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 61103/61640.13-08272
04/03/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/04/12 & 04/05/13.13-09722
04/18/2013MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause (61640). Nos. 61103/6164013-11491
04/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix addressing the issues raised in both appeals. Nos. 61103/6164013-12432
06/24/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief.13-18404
06/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief Due July 29, 2013.13-18407
07/26/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief.13-22172
08/08/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until August 28, 2013, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 61103/61640.13-23298
08/29/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-25581
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.13-25584
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.13-25586
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3.13-25587
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix- Volume 4.13-25588
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 5.13-25589
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 6.13-25590
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 7.13-25591
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 8.13-25593
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 9.13-25594
09/23/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time -Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief13-28433
09/23/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: October 30, 2013. Nos. 61103/61640.13-28435
10/31/2013BriefFiled Respondent Nevada Direct Insurance Company's Answering Brief.13-32709
11/26/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 61103/61640.13-35657
12/27/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until January 13, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 61103/61640.13-39421
01/14/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 61103/61640.14-01427
01/14/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. Nos. 61103/61640.14-18583
07/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. Nos. 61103/6164015-22984
08/24/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. No's. 61103/61640.15-25543
08/24/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. No's. 61103/61640.
09/10/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 28, 2015. Nos. 61103/6164015-25543
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)