Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61390
Short Caption:MIKA VS. DIST. CT. (CPS SECURITY (USA), INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A655195Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/08/2013 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:11/08/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2012Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Leon M. Greenberg.
08/01/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-24278
08/01/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.12-24281
09/24/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRS 34.170, Directing Proper Service of Petition, and Directing Answer. Certifice of service for petition for writ and appendix due from petitioners: 5 days. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket to conform to the caption in this order. Real parties in interest's answer to writ petition due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.12-30076
09/26/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellant's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Appendix.12-30450
10/09/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRS 34.170. Petitioners shall have five days to comply with NRS 34.170 by filing the required affidavit and providing this court with proof of service of that document on respondents and real parties in interest.12-31893
10/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Verification.12-32175
11/02/2012Petition/WritFiled Real Parties In Interest's Answering Brief To Petition For Writ Of Mandamus.12-34628
11/02/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief To Petition For Writ of Mandamus.12-34629
11/06/2012MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Petitioners to File Reply to Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-35107
12/28/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply provisionally received in this court on December 17, 2012.12-41157
12/28/2012Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition.12-41158
01/18/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-02119
06/13/2013BriefFiled Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-17353
07/02/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority (Real Party In Interest).13-19354
09/20/2013BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority (Real Party In Interest).13-28140
09/25/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority.13-28705
10/08/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, November 6, 2013, @ 10:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes.13-30132
10/15/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. This matter was previously scheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on Wednesday, November 6, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. The time for argument is hereby changed, and oral argument before the en banc court will be held on Friday, November 8, 2013, at the hour of 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas.13-30856
10/16/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, November 8, 2013, @ 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes.13-31032
10/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-31771
10/22/2013BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Real Parties in Interest)13-31807
11/04/2013BriefFiled Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority and Notice of Reliance Upon Supplemental Authority.13-33170
11/08/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Petitioners: 30 days to file and serve a supplemental brief. Real parties in interest: 15 days to file a response. The briefs shall comply with the page-length/type-volume limits on reply briefs. Petitioners may file and serve a reply of no more than five pages (or the corresponding type-volume limitations in NRAP 32) within ten days of the date that real parties in interest file and serve their response.13-37873
01/14/2014BriefFiled Supplemental Brief.14-01387
01/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix.14-01388
01/29/2014BriefFiled Real Parties In Interest's Response To Petitioners Supplemental Briefing Pursuant To The Court's Order Of December 13, 2013.14-03022
02/11/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Reply Supplemental Briefing as per the Courts Order of December 13, 2013.14-04428
02/27/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-06502
06/25/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-20876
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. EN BANC Nos. 60673/6139015-28854
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-31698
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)