Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61553
Short Caption:C. NICHOLAS PEREOS, LTD. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1000444Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/29/2012 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/18/2013How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/23/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-26706
08/23/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.12-26708
08/27/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from C. Nicholas Pereos, Ltd. Check no. 1667.
08/29/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg.12-27322
09/04/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-27900
09/18/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 17, 2012, at 9:00 a.m.12-29492
11/15/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.12-36316
11/21/2012Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.12-37008
12/05/2012Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.12-38319
12/05/2012Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure by Appellant.12-38320
02/15/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-04906
02/19/2013AppendixFiled Index to Appellant's Appendix.13-05118
02/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included, Volumes 1 through 5.13-05119
02/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Restated Appellant's Opening Brief. (Correction to page numbers referencing the appendix)13-05177
03/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Bank of America, N.A.'s Notice of Appearance (Michael N. Poli and Jody L. Buzicky of Poli & Ball, P.L.C. appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.).13-07883
03/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure of Respondent Bank of America, N.A.13-07886
03/15/2013MotionFiled Respondent Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Extension of Time to file Answering Brief and Appendix.13-07888
03/15/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief and Appendix due: April 17, 2013.13-07926
04/18/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief of Respondent Bank of America13-11435
04/18/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix13-11449
04/18/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata. (Answering brief)13-11492
05/16/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-14539
05/16/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/18/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument..13-31338
10/18/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Hardesty, C.J., Parraguirre, and Cherry, JJ. Author: Hardesty, C.J. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. NNP1315-20161
07/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-22613
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 25, 2015.15-22613
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/63810 (Letter entered in 63179 as document no. 15-33995)