Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61567
Short Caption:FULBROOK VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO. C/W 62199Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:61567*, 62199Related Case(s):62199
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A525299Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/2012 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/26/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
08/27/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-26961
08/27/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.12-26965
08/30/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes.12-27553
09/04/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Check no. 102141.
09/06/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.12-28147
09/17/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin.12-29290
09/27/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-30498
10/11/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 11/2/12 at 9:00 a.m.12-32189
11/05/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.12-34872
11/08/2012Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.12-35371
12/03/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.12-37971
12/10/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/30/10 and 6/15/11 To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen.12-38785
12/17/2012MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 61567/62199.12-39868
01/31/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Setting Revised Schedule. Appellants shall have until March 22, 2013, to file the opening brief and appendix addressing the issues in these consolidated appeals.13-03240
03/08/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/20/12. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen13-07193
03/18/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.13-08025
03/18/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: April 22, 2013.13-08126
04/22/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11825
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume I. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11842
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume II. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11843
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume III. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11846
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume IV. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11847
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume V. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11848
05/22/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insurance Company to File Answering Brief. Due June 21, 2013.13-15078
05/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved Answering Brief Due June 21, 2013.13-15089
06/17/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insurance Company to File Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/6219913-17720
06/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until July 22, 2013 to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-18829
07/23/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insruance Company to File Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/6219913-21502
07/30/2013AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume I.13-22357
08/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for an Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on July 30, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-23014
08/06/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief -Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-23015
08/30/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.13-25741
08/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 7, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-25772
10/07/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). Nos. 61567/62199.13-29884
11/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on October 21, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-33984
11/13/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-33986
12/10/2013BriefFiled Citation to Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 61567/6219913-37247
09/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this matter, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 61567/62199.14-32144
09/26/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/30/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." PICKERING, J., concuring in part, and dissenting in part. Nos. 61567/62199. NNP14-RP/KP/NS.15-03276
02/24/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-05864
02/24/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2015MotionFiled Motion to Recall Remittitur. Nos. 61567/62199.15-06283
03/09/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Recall Remittitur. Nos. 61567/62199.15-07263
03/11/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 27, 2015.15-05864
06/04/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Motion denied." Before: Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. NNP14-RP/NS/KP Nos. 61567/6219915-17026