The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0478
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SCR 210 RE: CLE REQUIREMENTSClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:08/29/2012Public Hearing:11/05/2012 at 3:00 PM (Carson City)
12/05/2013 at 1:30 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
06/06/2016 at 3:00 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:07/08/2014

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition.12-27443
10/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing (Exhibit A attached). Hearing to be held Monday, November 5, 2012, at 3 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on November 1, 2012. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than November 1, 2012.12-31458
10/22/2012Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Kimberly Farmer stating that Frank Flaherty, President, State Bar of Nevada, will attend the public hearing and will provide comments.12-33490
11/05/2012Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/06/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Janet Pancoast.12-35134
11/06/2012Administrative CaseFiled Letter from CLE Board with information about CLE credits required in other jurisdictions.12-35135
11/26/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kristine Kuzemka.12-37223
11/26/2012Administrative CaseFiled Supplemental Response from State Bar Board of Governors.12-37227
12/03/2012Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jordan Savage, Deputy Public Defender.12-38022
01/10/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 210 (Exhibit A attached). Effective 30 days from the date of this order.13-01091
08/29/2013Administrative CaseFiled Motion for Clarification.13-25573
11/14/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Thursday, December 5, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. at RJC in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comment invited. Original and 8 copies due by November 27, 2013, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by November 27, 2013. (Exhibit A attached.)13-34195
12/05/2013Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
03/20/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule Supreme Court Rule 210. (Exhibit A attached.) Effective 30 days from the date of this order. EN BANC14-08955
07/08/2014Administrative CaseCase Closed.
02/02/2016Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
02/02/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition.Y16-03532
04/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Monday, June 6, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. at RJC in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comment invited. Original and 8 copies due by June 2, 2016, at 5:00 p.m. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by June 2, 2016. (Exhibit attached.)16-12674
06/06/2016Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
06/21/2016Administrative CaseFiled Amended Petition.Y16-19406
12/27/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. We direct the Continuing Legal Education Committee of the State Bar of Nevada and the Nevada Board of Continuing Legal education to formulate a curriculum specifically designed to assist attorneys in recognizing the symptoms of substance abuse or addictive disorders and the steps be taken in reporting or assisting attorneys with those issues. The curriculum shall be formulated within 60 days from the date of this order.16-40209
03/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled CLE Curriculum and Regulations from the State Bar of Nevada. (Exhibits attached.)17-06934