Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61626
Short Caption:VAILE VS. VAILECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36969, 37082, 51981, 52244, 52457, 52593, 53687, 53798, 55396, 55446, 55911, 60502, 61321, 61415, 61415-COA, 62797, 62797-COA, 68715, 77070
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D230385Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/05/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
09/05/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED PER ORDER FILED 10/22/12. DOCUMENT TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 61415)
09/05/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.12-27927
09/05/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.12-27929
09/12/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Consolidate and Motion to Defer Filing Fee and Cost Bond.12-28762
09/12/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.12-28775
10/22/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order. The clerk of this court is directed to administratively close the appeal pending in Docket No. 61626 and to transfer the September 5, 2012, notice of appeal filed under that docket number to Docket No. 61415. District Court: Record on Appeal due: 30 days. With regard to the bonds for costs on appeal, requests to vary the amount of the $500 bond required to cover costs on appeal must be made in the district court. Appellant's motion to defer payment of that bond is denied. We grant appellant's motion in part, for the limited purpose of allowing appellant to file an opening brief. Appellant: Opening Brief due: 50 days. Respondent need not file an answering brief unless directed to do so by this court. We conclude that a stay is not warranted and we therefore deny appellant's motion for a stay. Having considered the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, we conclude that it should be denied. Fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot all requests for relief pending in Docket No. 61626.] Fn2[On September 12, 2012, appellant filed in Docket No. 61415 a motion seeking to consolidate Docket No. 61415 and 61626 and to defer payment of the filing fee and cost bond in Docket No. 61626. As we have directed that the appeal pending in Docket No. 61626 be administratively closed, this motion is denied as moot.] Fn4[The clerk of this court is directed to file appellant's reply, which was provisionally received in this court on September 20, 2012, and appellant's supplemental reply, which was provisionally received on September 26, 2012. As we have directed the filing of these documents, we deny as moot appellant's October 1, 2012, motion to waive deficiency in reply brief or to authorize the filings of an amended reply brief.] Fn5[The clerk of this court is directed to file appellant's motion, which was provisionally received in this court on September 26, 2012.] Fn6[With regard to the relief requested by appellant through a letter filed in this court on September 4, 2012. No action will be taken on appellant's letter.] Nos. 61415/6162612-33335