Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0479
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO SCR 216 IOLTA ACCOUNTSCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:09/05/2012Public Hearing:11/05/2012 at 3:00 PM (Carson City)
06/05/2014 at 3:00 PM (Regional Justice Center Las Vegas)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Petition.12-27995
10/05/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing (Exhibit A attached). Hearing to be held Monday, November 5, 2012, at 3 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on November 1, 2012. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than November 1, 2012.12-31456
11/05/2012Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/29/2012Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 216 (Exhibit A attached). Effective 30 days from the date of this order.12-37641
01/03/2013Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
04/15/2014Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
04/15/2014Administrative CaseFiled Joint Petition.14-12056
04/29/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Setting Public Hearing. A copy of the petition and the proposed amendments is attached to this order. Thursday, June 5, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to the Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5:00 p.m. on May 30, 2014.14-13854
06/05/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.
06/19/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 216 (Exhibit A attached). Effective 30 days from the date of this order.14-20232
06/27/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Alan J. Lefebvre, President, State Bar of Nevada regarding Supreme Court Order Transferring IOLTA Program.14-21199
07/18/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Nevada Bar Foundation regarding Order transferring IOLTA Program Management to Nevada Bar Foundation (with attachments).14-23318
07/18/2014MotionFiled Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e), Pursuant to Supreme Court Rule 216, for An Order: (1) Approving the SBN's Designation of Foundation and Directing the Transfer of All IOLTA Assets, Books and Records to Foundation; and (2) Appointing Foundation Board Members14-23445
07/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. The Justice League of Nevada, and any other interested party, shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, July 23, 2014, to file and serve a response.14-23455
07/21/2014Administrative CaseFiled Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e), Pursuant to Supreme Court Rule 216, for An Order: (1) Approving the SBN's Designation of Foundation and Directing the Transfer of All IOLTA Assets, Books and Records to Foundation; and (2) Appointing Foundation Board Members. (Original-via mail)14-23575
07/23/2014Administrative CaseFiled Response and Request to Modify the Timing and Procedural Relief Requested in Emergency Petition (via fax).14-24071
07/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. The State Bar Board of Governors and the Nevada Bar Foundation shall have until 12:00 p.m. on Monday, July 28, 2014, to file and serve any reply.14-24168
07/28/2014Administrative CaseFiled Reply in Support of the State Bar's Emergency Petition. (via-fax)14-24521
07/30/2014Administrative CaseFiled Reply in Support of the State Bar's Emergency Petition. (Original)
07/31/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Designating Foundation Under Supreme Court Rule 216 and Directing Transfer of all IOLTA Assets, Books and Records to Foundation. NBF is appointed as the designated SCR 216 IOLTA foundation in place and instead of the JLN effective August 31, 2014. JLN transfer all IOLTA funds, books, and records to the NBF no later than August 31, 2014. Individuals appointed to the NBF Board of Trustees effective August 31, 2014. Pickering, J., concurring.14-25034
08/21/2014Administrative CaseFiled Motion. Emergency Petition under NRAP 27(e) requesting clarification from court on conditions to appointment of NBF as IOLTA Foundation.14-27664
08/22/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. On August 21, 2014, the JLN filed an emergency motion. This court determined that a response to the motion would be helpful in resolving the matter. State Bar Board of Governors and the Nevada Bar Foundation shall have until 12:00 p.m. on Monday, August 25, 2014, to file and serve a reply. Fn1[The answer shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile with the clerk of this court in Carson City.]14-27697
08/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Response to Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e), requesting Clarification from Court on Conditions to Appointment of NBF as IOLTA Foundation.14-28012
08/26/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. On July 31, 2014, this court entered an order appointing the Nevada Bar Foundation as the designated SCR 216 IOLTA foundation in place of the Justice League of Nevada, effective August 31, 2014. On August 21, 2014, the JLN filed an emergency motion requesting clarification. The State Bar of Governors and the Nevada Bar Foundation filed a response on August 25, 2014. Having reviewd the motion and response, this court clarifies its previous order. Although this court previously directed that the IOLTA assets be transferred to the NBF on August 31, 2014, because of the holiday closure of the banks, the transfer shall occur on September 2, 2014.14-28214
08/27/2014Administrative CaseFiled Response to Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e), requesting Clarification from Court on Conditions to Appointment of NBF as IOLTA Foundation. (Original)14-28347
10/01/2014Administrative CaseFiled Request to Approve Reserve Funds: Status Report on (i) Conversion of Nevada Bar Foundation to Public Charity and (ii) IOLTA Program Managment.14-32618
11/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order. In order to better provide future unanticipated needs of legal aid providers who rely on other funding sources, this court has determined that the NBF should maintain reserves of $600,000 plus two percent of the annual IOLTA revenues, accumulating to a maximum total of $800,000.14-38878
03/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Report pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.15-06492
02/29/2016Administrative CaseFiled Report pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.16-06467
10/25/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Cynthia Alexander; Kirk Jacobsen; Mark Knobel; Margaret Wightman Lambrose; and Lori Teicher are reappointed as members for two-year terms commencing July 1, 2016, and expiring June 30, 2018. Rendal B. Miller is appointed as a member for a term commencing immediately and expiring June 30, 2018.16-33397
03/03/2017Administrative CaseFiled Annual Statement of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.17-07311
12/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Nevada bar Foundation, Kimberly Farmer regarding a request to appoint a Trustee to serve as a replacement for Kirk Jacobson for a two-year term commencing January 2018.17-41469
12/12/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Trustee of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Sarah Guindy appointed for a two-year term commencing on January 1, 2018, and expiring on January 1, 2020.17-42674
03/16/2018Administrative CaseFiled Annual Statement of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.18-10472
06/28/2018Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Nevada Bar Foundation, Kimberly Farmer regarding a request to reappoint trustees for a two-year term effective July 2018.18-24633
06/28/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Two-year terms commencing July 1, 2018 and expiring June 30, 2020.18-24636
03/06/2019Administrative CaseFiled Annual Statement of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.19-10045
02/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Annual Statement of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Pursuant to SCR 216(5) and 220.5.20-07210
07/27/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Reappointing and Appointing Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation. Cynthia Alexander, Margaret Wightman Lambrose, Rendal B. Miller, and Lori Teicher are reappointed as members of the Board of Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation for two-year terms commencing July 31, 2020, and expiring July 31, 2022. Sarah Guindy is reappointed as a member of the Board of Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation for two-year term retroactively commencing January 1, 2020, and expiring January 1, 2022. Cassell von Baeyer is appointed as a member of the Board of Trustees of the Nevada Bar Foundation for a two-year term commencing July 31, 2020, and expiring July 31, 2022. (SC).20-27226