The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61663
Short Caption:RYE PATCH GOLD US VS. DIST. CT. (COUER ROCHESTER)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV1103482Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/13/2013 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/13/2013How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Thomas P. Erwin. Check no. 3968.
09/10/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.12-28561
09/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Petition. (Hon. Michael Montero).12-28562
09/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Petition. (Parsons Behle & Latimer).12-28563
09/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing of Petition. (Served on Hon. Michael Montero).12-28564
09/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing of Petition. (Served on Parsons Behle & Latimer).12-28566
09/10/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volumes 1-4. (CD included)12-28567
09/17/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 5. (CD included).12-29385
09/17/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, a Writ of Prohibition.12-29389
09/17/2012Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1(a) Disclosure.12-29392
09/17/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Motion to Stay.12-29393
09/17/2012MotionFiled Motion for Stay.12-29394
09/26/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.12-30465
09/26/2012MotionFiled Opposition to Motion for Stay.12-30466
10/02/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 6.12-31168
10/03/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Petitioners' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay Exceeding 5 Pages.12-31222
10/03/2012MotionReceived Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay. (FILED PER ORDER 10/5/12)
10/05/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion for Stay. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We stay the district court's May 9, 2012, order appointing a special master, and August 10, 2012, order denying petitioners' motion for revocation of the appointment of the special master, entered in Sixth Judicial District Court Case No. CV1111231, pending further order of this court. Fn1[Having considered petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply exceeding five pages, we grant it and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply provisionally received in this court on October 3, 2012.]12-31453
10/05/2012MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay.12-31457
11/06/2012Petition/WritFiled Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-35110
11/06/2012AppendixFiled Respondent Coeur Rochester, Inc.'s Supplemental Appendix.12-35111
11/16/2012Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply to answer to petition due: November 28, 2012.12-36400
11/27/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Replyy to the Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-37438
12/03/2012MotionFiled Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-38063
12/03/2012MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Petitioners' Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Exceeding Fifteen Pages.12-38066
12/03/2012MotionReceived Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER 12/17/12)
12/03/2012AppendixReceived Petitioners' Appendix Volumes 7-8. CD included. (FILED PER ORDER 12/17/12)
12/06/2012MotionFiled Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Petitioners' Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Exceeding Fifteen Pages.12-38496
12/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Denying as Unnecessary Motion for Excess Pages. The clerk of this court shall file the proposed reply and volumes 7 and 8 of the appendix, both of which were provisionally received in this court on December 3, 2012.12-39883
12/17/2012Petition/WritFiled Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-39885
12/17/2012AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volumes 7-8. CD included.12-39886
12/18/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Ammended Certificate of Compliance for the Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, for a Writ of Prohibition.12-40023
12/18/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Ammended Certificate of Compliance for the Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Response to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus.12-40016
12/18/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Compliance for a Motion for Leave to File Petitioners' Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Exceeding Fifteen Pages.12-40018
03/15/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 13, 2013, @ 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-07848
04/29/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice13-12356
05/13/2013Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP13 JH/RP/MC.
07/16/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Dismissal of District Court Action.13-20855
07/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Petitioners shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this petition for extraordinary writ relief should not be dismissed in light of the district court's order dismissing the underlying action. Real party in interest shall have 15 days from service of petitioners' response to file and serve any reply.13-21368
08/06/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioners shall have until August 13, 2013, to file and serve the response to the order to show cause.13-23023
08/08/2013MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.13-23333
08/22/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Response to Order to Show Cause. (Reply)13-24825
09/09/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "We dismiss the petition." Fn1[In light of this order, we vacate the stay imposed by our October 5, 2012, order.] NNP13-JH/RP/MC.13-26466
10/04/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-29653
10/04/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.