Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61690
Short Caption:HUMPHRIES VS. DIST. CT. (NEW YORK-NEW YORK HOTEL & CASINO)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65316
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A641181Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/08/2013 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/2012Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Craig W. Drummond.
09/13/2012Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-29061
09/14/2012Petition/WritFiled Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-29081
09/14/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.12-29082
09/14/2012MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Determination of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.12-29148
09/26/2012MotionFiled Real Party in Interest New York-New York Hotel & Casino, LLC's Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings.12-30380
10/05/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We stay the proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A641181, pending further order of this court.12-31451
10/11/2012MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Pursuant to NRCP 42.12-32384
10/30/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Clustering Appeals. Nos. 61189/61690.12-34213
11/06/2012Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest New York-New York Hotel & Casino, LLC's Answer to Petitionrs' Writ of Mandamus.12-35047
11/06/2012AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest New York-New York Hotel & Casino, LLC's Appendix to Answer to Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus.12-35048
11/20/2012Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition.12-36898
11/20/2012AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume II.12-36899
02/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 8, 2013, @ 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.13-04502
03/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-08690
04/08/2013Case Status UpdateOral Argument held this day (not submitted). To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP13 JH/RP/MC
04/08/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner: Supplemental Appendix due: 15 days.13-10219
04/09/2013AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix, Volume III.13-10351
04/19/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing.13-11573
04/26/2013MotionFiled Response to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing.13-12324
05/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to File Supplemental Brief. We therefore direct the clerk of this court to file the supplemental briefs provisionally received in Docket Nos. 61189 and 61690 on April 19, 2013. Real party in interest in Docket No. 61189 and petitioners in Docket No. 61690 shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve any response to the supplemental briefs. Nos. 61189/61690.13-14759
05/20/2013BriefFiled Real Party In Interest New York-New York Hotel & Casino, LLC's Supplemental Brief.13-14761
06/04/2013BriefFiled Petitioners' Response to Real Party in Interest New York New York Hotel & Casino's Supplemental Briefing.13-16403
11/07/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition Granted." Before Hardesty, Parraguirre and Cherry, JJ.. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85. NNP1313-33448
11/07/2013WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Craig W. Drummond for service upon Judge Michael Villani.13-33471
11/20/2013WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Michael Villani on 11/18/13.13-35042
12/02/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-36056
12/02/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.