Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61865
Short Caption:RENTERIA-NOVOA (GUILLERMO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60909, 68239
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C268285Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/12/2014 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/12/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/10/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/10/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-32026
10/31/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.12-34338
10/31/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/05/10 (Kiara Schmidt), 01/26/11 (Maureen Schorn), 04/19/11, 04/28/11, 05/03/11, 05/17/11, 11/01/11, 01/17/12, 05/10/12, 05/15/12, 05/21/12, 05/22/12, 05/23/12, 05/24/12, 05/25/12, 09/06/12 (Sara Richardson) To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt, Maureen Schorn & Sara Richardson.12-34339
11/21/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/11.12-37069
12/13/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/19/11, 04/28/11, 05/03/11, 05/17/11, 11/01/11, 01/17/12, 05/10/12, 05/15/12, 05/21/12, 05/22/12, 05/23/12, 05/24/12, 05/25/12, 09/06/12.12-39484
12/17/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/5/10.12-39937
01/29/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Flie Opening Brief.13-03069
01/29/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: March 08, 2013.13-03101
03/08/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief and Appendix)13-07171
03/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for a second extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due May 7, 2013.13-07327
05/07/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time.13-13428
05/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 21, 2013.13-14735
06/21/2013MotionFiled Motion for Fifteen Day Extension of Time.13-18387
06/27/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 8, 2013.13-18985
07/09/2013MotionFiled Motion for Seven Day Extension of Time.13-19931
07/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 15, 2013.13-20459
07/16/2013MotionFiled Motion for Two Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.13-20787
07/18/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Motion for One Day Extension13-21069
07/19/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitations.13-21156
07/19/2013MotionFiled Motion to Transmit Exhibit.13-21157
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I.13-21171
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II.13-21172
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III.13-21173
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV.13-21174
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V.13-21175
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI.13-21176
07/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VII.13-21181
07/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We therefore direct the clerk of this court to reject the opening brief received via E-Flex on July 19, 2013. Appellant: 30 days to file and serve the opening brief. Fn1[We defer ruling on appellant's motion asking this court to direct the district court clerk to transmit an original exhibit pending the filing of the opening brief.]13-22155
08/27/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief.13-25332
09/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Exhibit. District court clerk: 30 days to transmit State's Exhibit 27, described on the exhibit list as "Defendant's Audio Statement."13-26957
09/26/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitation.13-28834
10/07/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received via E-Flex on September 26, 2013. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the reply brief, if deemed necessary.13-29791
10/07/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-29792
11/01/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.13-32947
11/01/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: December 06, 2013.13-32955
12/09/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-36968
12/09/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/24/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-13232
04/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Thursday, June 12, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-13342
05/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-17512
06/12/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14- JH/MD/MC.
09/24/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP14-JH/MD/MC.14-31814
10/21/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-35031
10/21/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 24, 2014.14-35031