Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61871
Short Caption:ANDERSON VS. MANDALAY CORP. C/W 61305Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:61305*, 61871Related Case(s):61305
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A614344Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/04/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/10/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/10/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-32091
10/10/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.12-32093
10/11/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Eglet Wall. Check no. 09129.
10/16/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee due on Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/16/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.)12-32860
10/17/2012Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-32995
10/17/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/14/12 & 08/29/12. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Hon. Valerie Adair.12-33032
10/18/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane & Johnson, Chtd. Check No. 287960.
10/25/2012Docketing StatementFiled Respondent Mandalay Corp., d/b/a Mandalay Bay Resort & Casino's Response to Appellants' Docketing Statement.12-33795
10/25/2012Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeaks.12-33940
11/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants)12-35102
11/09/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents).12-35472
11/13/2012Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 09323 returned to Eglet Wall.
12/03/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and to Show Cause. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why these consolidated appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents/cross-appellants may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants/cross-respondents' response is served. Briefing suspended. Nos. 61305/6187112-37995
12/18/2012MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 61305/6187112-40025
12/26/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have February 1, 2013, to file and serve the response. Nos. 61305/61871.12-40784
01/04/2013MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 61305/6187113-00415
01/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why these consolidated appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Fn1[The clerk of this court shall amend these dockets' caption to conform to the caption of this order.] Nos. 61305/61871.13-03065
02/21/2013MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 61305/6187113-05502
06/11/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Respondent/cross-appellant: Transcript request due: 11 days (Docket No. 61871). Court reporter Janie Olsen: Certificate of delivery due: 15 days. Appellants/cross-respondents: Opening Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 61305/6187113-17016
06/13/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested in Docket 61871. Nos. 61305/6187113-17522
06/19/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. Nos. 61305/61871.13-17992
06/20/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/23/12.13-18202
07/10/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.13-20217
07/10/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: August 12, 2013. Nos. 61305/61871.13-20239
08/12/2013MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.13-23551
08/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellants shall have until September 11, 2013, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 61305/61871.13-24033
08/26/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25139
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol I. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25140
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol II. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25143
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25174
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25175
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume V. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25176
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VI. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25177
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VII. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25181
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VIII. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25184
08/26/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IX. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25185
08/27/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to the joint Appendix, Volume I Part B. Nos. 61305/61871.13-25381
09/26/2013BriefFiled Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Answering Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.13-28829
10/22/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.13-31683
10/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: November 27, 2013.13-31696
11/21/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.13-35177
11/21/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/05/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Supplemental Brief to Appellants Reply Brief. Nos. 61305/61871. (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 3/25/2014.)13-36648
12/11/2013MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief to Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 61305/6187113-37491
03/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to File Supplemental Brief. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed supplemental brief from respondent/cross-appellant's motion and return the brief, unfiled. Nos. 61305/61871.14-09325
12/04/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 61305/61871.14-39427
01/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 4, 2015, @1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-00529
01/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-02200
02/02/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Leave to File Respondent's Mandalay Corp.'s Supplemental Brief. Nos. 61305/61871. (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND RETURNED, UNFILED PER ORDER 2/5/15).15-03506
02/04/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/04/2015OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
02/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall detach the proposed supplemental brief from the motion for leave to file a supplemental brief and return the brief, unfiled. Nos. 61305/61871.15-03840
02/10/2015BriefFiled Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Notice of Supplemental Authorities.15-04315
02/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellants/cross-respondents' supplemental brief due: 15 days. Respondent/cross-appellant's response due: 15 days thereafter. The page/type-volume limitations applicable to reply briefs uner NRAP32(a)(7)(A) shall apply.15-06072
03/12/2015MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion for Extension of time to File Supplemental Briefing. Nos. 61305/61871.15-07633
03/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents' Supplemental Brief due: March 20, 2015. Respondent/cross-appellant's Response due: April 6, 2015.15-07722
03/18/2015MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Supplemental Brief). Nos. 61305/61871.15-08222
03/19/2015MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing. Nos. 61305/61873.15-08374
03/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants/cross-respondents supplemental brief (20 pages) due: March 30, 2015. Nos. 61305/61871.15-09348
03/30/2015MotionFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Reconsider Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline. Nos. 61305/61871 (Brief attached)15-09559
04/03/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Motion to Reconsider Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, or in the Alternative, Motion to Extend Deadline. Nos. 61305/6187115-10049
04/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until April 10, 2015, to file a supplemental brief of 20 pages. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until April 27, 2015, to file and serve a response. Nos. 61305/61871.15-10349
04/14/2015BriefFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.15-11221
04/24/2015MotionFiled Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Response to Appellants'/Cross-Respondents' Supplemental Brief). Nos. 61305/61871. (DETACHED RESPONSE AND FILED PER 4/28/15 ORDER.)15-12553
04/28/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Respondent's Supplemental Brief. Nos. 61305/61871.15-12801
04/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the response, attached as Exhibit A to the motion, and file it separately in these consolidated appeals. fn1[The parties' stipulation for an extension of time to file the response is approved.] Nos. 61305/61871.15-12912
04/28/2015BriefFiled Respondent Mandalay Corp.'s Supplemental Brief. (Response to Appellants'/Cross-Respondents' Supplemental Brief). Nos. 61305/61871.15-12919
10/15/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 82. EN BANC Nos. 61305/6187115-31341
11/09/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 61305/61871.15-34078
11/09/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 61305/61871.
11/30/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 14, 2015.15-34078
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)