The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62059
Short Caption:ANDERSON VS. SANCHEZClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV33475Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:11/26/2012 / Jimmerson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/19/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
11/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-35125
11/06/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.12-35128
11/15/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Abrams Law Firm, LLC. Check no. 19995.
11/16/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.12-36390
11/26/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson.12-37172
12/06/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-38505
12/12/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 14, 2013 at 9:00 a.m.12-39227
02/11/2013MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss This Appeal.13-04281
02/19/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 1/14/13 at 9:00 a.m. - 12:45 p.m.13-05147
02/19/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-05149
02/22/2013MotionFiled Response To Motion To Dismiss The Appeal.13-05588
02/27/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended pending this court's review and resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal.13-06120
03/06/2013MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to File Reply to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss this Appeal.13-06840
03/08/2013MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Set Bond or Other Security as A Condition of a Stay.13-07188
03/15/2013MotionFiled Response to Motion to Set Bond or Other Security as a Condition of Stay.13-07953
03/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Response to Motion to Set Bond or Other Security as a Condition of Stay.13-08249
03/19/2013MotionFiled Reply In Support of Motion To Set Bond or Other Security As A Condition of Stay.13-08260
03/19/2013MotionFiled Response to Motion to File Reply to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss this Appeal.13-08263
03/22/2013MotionFiled Reply to Response Reply to Response to Supplemental Brief in Response to the February 6, 2013 Order Directing Supplemental Briefing (Inadvertently filed in the wrong case.)
04/29/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Denying Motion to Set Bond. Fn1[The clerk of this court shall file the reply, provisionally received on March 5, 2013.]13-12416
04/29/2013MotionFiled Reply to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss this Appeal.13-12417
06/03/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 90 days in which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.13-16192
07/01/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Verbatim Reporting and Transcription, LLC Dates Requested. 8/21/12 and 9/18/12.13-19257
08/28/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Filing of Appellant's Opening Brief.13-25455
08/28/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: October 01, 2013.13-25458
09/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Completion and Delivery of Transcripts.13-26491
10/02/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. I.13-29335
10/02/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Vol. 2.13-29336
10/02/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-29397
11/05/2013MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answering Brief.13-33194
11/19/2013AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1.13-34759
12/17/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on November 19, 2013.13-38277
12/17/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief -Respondent's Answering Brief.13-38289
12/27/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. Law Office of Daniel Marks.13-39368
01/13/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: January 24, 2014.14-01185
01/24/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-02610
01/24/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.14-05457
02/19/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/22/2014MotionFiled Stipulation (Vanguard QDRO Account shall be frozen to Secure Funds pending outcome of Appeal).14-16770
06/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant and respondent have filed a stipulation providing that the Vanguard QDRO Account, Account Number 005300, shall be frozen to secure funds pending the outcome of this appeal or further order of this court. We approve the stipulation.14-18467
12/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Each party shall have until January 5, 2015, to file a written statement of no more than 500 words explaining why this court should not assign this appeal to the court of appeals. No extensions of time will be granted.14-41995
12/30/2014MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Reassignment of This Appeal to the Court of Appeals.14-42500
12/31/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Reassignment of the Appeal to the Court of Appeals.14-42576
01/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition.15-00456
07/23/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled "Reversed and Remanded with instructions." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Silver. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 12/31/15).
08/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Review due: August 17, 2015.15-24092
08/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Corrected Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent shall have until August 17, 2015, to file and serve the petition for review.15-24110
08/18/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
08/18/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Verified Bill of Costs. (Transferred from Court of Appeals on 8/18/15)15-25003
08/18/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review.15-25004
10/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.15-32241
10/23/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Clarification of Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review.15-32394
11/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We decline to clarify our prior order on this basis. Counsel shall exercise his professional judgment in responding to the petition and may express his concern with the adequacy of the petition within his answer. To the extent appellant requests that this court direct respondent to file an amended petition, we decline to do so. Appellant's answer shall conform to the formatting, filing, copy, and page or type-volume requirements set forth in NRAP 40B(d) for petitions. Appellant shall have until November 30, 2015, to file and serve the answer to the petition.15-34687
12/01/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Respondent's Petition for Review.15-36496
12/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Withdrawing Opinion. We direct the clerk of this court to withdraw the opinion in this matter from publication pending our resolution of respondent's petition for review.15-40154
01/25/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review. The petition for review is granted and this matter is submitted for decision on review without further briefing or oral argument. Fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]16-02397
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/6456916-04455
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 34. EN BANC16-13323
05/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-16258
05/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 2016.16-16258