Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62061
Short Caption:MARDIAN VS. GREENBERG FAMILY TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A584254Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/13/2012 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/04/2014 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/04/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
11/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-35150
11/06/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.12-35153
11/07/2012Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall
11/07/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.12-35236
11/13/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman.12-35961
11/27/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-37353
12/13/2012Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 9, 2013, at 9:30 a.m.12-39303
02/07/2013MotionFiled Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement.13-04004
02/07/2013MotionFiled Motion For Permission to File Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and waive Bond Requirement In Excess of 10 Pages, But Not In Excess of 19 Pages.13-04035
02/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Motion with Excess Pages. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file a stay motion with excess pages. Having considered the motion, we grant it. As the stay motion was inadvertently filed on February 7, 2012, appellants are not required to resubmit the motion for filing.13-04784
02/20/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service for Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement.13-05348
02/20/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement.13-05367
02/27/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-06029
02/27/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellants to file Their Reply In Support of Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement.13-06039
02/28/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Fn3 [We defer ruling on appellants' motion for stay at this time.]13-06296
03/18/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay. Fn1[The parties have filed a stipulation to extend the time for appellants to file a reply in support of their motion. Having reviewed the stipulation, we approve it. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to file the reply, provisionally received in this court on March 1, 2013. The reply was considered in resolving the motion for a stay.]13-08010
03/18/2013MotionFiled Reply to Response -Reply to Opposition to Motion Pursuant to NRAP 8(a) to Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement.13-08011
03/19/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-08218
05/22/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Stipulation For Extension Of Time To File Opening Brief (First Request)13-15077
05/23/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved Opening Brief Due June 28, 2013.13-15300
06/27/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.13-18975
06/27/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief.13-18976
07/25/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-22033
07/25/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure13-22032
08/26/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.13-25240
08/26/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening
04/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, June 4, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-13083
05/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-16374
06/04/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Suggestion of Bankruptcy of Susan Mardian.14-34705
11/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy Order.14-38925
12/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal may proceed, and we take no action on the suggestion of bankruptcy filed on October 17, 2014.14-39683
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 72. EN BANC15-28856
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-31704
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 22, 2015.15-31704
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)