Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62069
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/14/2013How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/08/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/08/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-35378
12/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days.12-39774
01/14/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-17. (Via FTP)13-01333
01/14/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/16/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Documents, "Confidential" sealed documents comprising pages 854-864 of the Record on Appeal. (PSI Report)
01/16/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Documents, "Confidential" sealed documents comprising pages 1592-1601 of the Record on Appeal. (PSI Report)
05/14/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS13-14214
07/09/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).13-19971
08/05/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-22927
08/05/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2013.13-22927