Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62119
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2013How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/16/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/16/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-36447
12/17/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days.12-39749
01/11/2013Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on January 4, 2013.13-01173
01/18/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal volumes 1-11 (via ftp).13-02164
01/18/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/24/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pgs. 301-309 (SEALED).
01/24/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pgs. 281-288 (SEALED).
02/20/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).13-05366
07/23/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP13- JH/RP/MC.13-21584
08/20/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-24528
08/20/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/30/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 23, 2013.13-24528