Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62120
Short Caption:JEFFERSON (BRANDON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70732, 70732-COA, 79052, 79052-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C268351Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/12/2014 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/12/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/16/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/16/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-36454
12/05/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.12-38245
12/05/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).12-38351
12/07/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/1/10; 11/5/10; 4/7/11; 4/12/11; 4/26/11; 5/19/11; 11/1/11; 12/1/11; 3/29/12; 4/19/12; 7/12/12; 7/26/12; 7/30/12; 7/31/12; 8/1/12; 8/2/12; 8/3/12; 8/6/12; 8/7/12; 8/8/12; 10/4/12; and 10/23/12. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Lisa Lizotte.12-38539
01/09/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa A. Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/7/11;4/12/11; 5/19/11; 11/1/11; 12/1/11; 3/29/12; 4/19/12; 7/26/12; 7/30/12; 7/31/12; 8/1/12; 8/2/12; 8/3/12; 8/6/12; 8/7/12; 8/8/12; 10/4/12; and 10/23/12.13-00974
01/14/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/1/10 and 11/5/10.13-01472
03/18/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.13-08076
03/18/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: April 17, 2013.13-08092
04/17/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief - 90 days).13-11415
04/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 16, 2013.13-11590
07/17/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time To File Opening Brief.13-20949
07/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a third extension of time (60 days) to file the opening brief. The motion is denied. Appellant shall have until August 15, 2013, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.13-22087
08/16/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief.13-24130
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol I.13-24131
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol II.13-24132
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol III.13-24133
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol IV.13-24135
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol V.13-24136
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol VI.13-24137
08/16/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol VII.13-24141
08/16/2013MotionFiled Motion to Transmit Exhibits.13-24203
08/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Exhibits. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit State's Exhibits 53,54, 55, and 56 to the clerk of this court.13-24403
09/13/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request. (Answering Brief)13-27177
09/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Answering Bried due: 10/16/13)13-27179
10/14/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-30628
11/13/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.13-33980
11/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due Date: December 13, 2013.13-33982
12/13/2013BriefFiled Reply Brief.13-37726
12/13/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/24/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-13252
04/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Thursday, June 12, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-13343
05/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-17513
06/12/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14- JH/MD/MC.
07/29/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP14-JH/MD/MC.14-24735
08/26/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-28226
08/26/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/09/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 3, 2014.14-28226