Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62189
Short Caption:EXCELLENCE COMMUNITY MGMT. VS. GILMORECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A666418Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/12/2012 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/18/2013How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/28/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/28/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)12-37555
11/28/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.12-37557
12/03/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Durham Jones & Pinegar, P.C. Check No. 005254.
12/12/2012Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.12-39180
12/20/2012Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.12-40341
12/31/2012MotionFiled Motion for Expedited Relief.12-41319
01/14/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.13-01434
01/24/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. We grant the motion for expedited relief. Appellant: five days to file a transcript request form; 15 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents: 15 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file the answering brief. Appellant: 15 days from service of respondents' answering brief to file a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Upon completion of briefing, resolution of this matter shall be expedited to the extent permitted by this court's calendar.13-02555
01/25/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/12/12 & 11/21/12 To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey.13-02710
02/06/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/12/12, 11/21/12.13-03903
02/08/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 15, 2013.13-04078
02/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.13-04996
02/15/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-05005
02/15/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. I13-05006
02/15/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. II13-05007
03/01/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Appendix Vol. I.13-06435
03/04/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering brief due: March 11, 2013.13-06591
03/12/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief Respondent's Answering Brief13-07367
03/22/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's reply brief due: April 3, 2013.13-08556
04/04/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-09862
04/04/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/18/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument..13-31337
10/18/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/18/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP13-JH/RP/MC (ORDER VACATED PER ORDER FILED 6/25/15)13-38421
01/07/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.14-00524
01/07/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael D. Rawlins
03/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.14-09614
04/10/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer in Opposition to Petition for Rehearing.14-11607
06/25/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Vacating Decision and Granting Petition for Rehearing. We vacate the Order of Affirmance entered on December 18, 2013, grant the petition for rehearing, and submit this matter for decision on rehearing.15-19366
06/25/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 38. NNP13-JH/RP/MC15-19367
07/20/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-21789
07/20/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/30/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 22, 2015.15-21789