Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62199
Short Caption:FULBROOK VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO. C/W 61567Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:61567*, 62199Related Case(s):61567
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A525299Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/26/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/29/2012Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
11/29/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-37654
11/29/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.12-37658
12/10/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Christensen Law Offices, LLC. Check No. 102625.
12/11/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Docketing Statement due: 20 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.12-38854
12/17/2012MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 61567/62199.12-39870
01/02/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.13-00075
01/11/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.13-01282
01/11/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-01283
01/31/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Setting Revised Schedule. Appellants shall have until March 22, 2013, to file the opening brief and appendix addressing the issues in these consolidated appeals.13-03240
03/08/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/20/12. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen13-07193
03/18/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.13-08025
03/18/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: April 22, 2013.13-08126
04/22/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11825
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume I. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11842
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume II. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11843
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume III. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11846
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume IV. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11847
04/23/2013AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume V. Nos. 61567/62199.13-11848
05/22/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insurance Company to File Answering Brief. Due June 21, 2013.13-15078
05/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved Answering Brief Due June 21, 2013.13-15089
06/17/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insurance Company to File Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/6219913-17720
06/26/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until July 22, 2013 to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-18829
07/23/2013MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Respondent Allstate Insruance Company to File Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/6219913-21502
07/30/2013AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume I.13-22357
08/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for an Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on July 30, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-23014
08/06/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief -Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-23015
08/30/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.13-25741
08/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 7, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-25772
10/07/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). Nos. 61567/62199.13-29884
11/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on October 21, 2013. Nos. 61567/62199.13-33984
11/13/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 61567/62199.13-33986
12/10/2013BriefFiled Citation to Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 61567/6219913-37247
09/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this matter, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 61567/62199.14-32144
09/26/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/30/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." PICKERING, J., concuring in part, and dissenting in part. Nos. 61567/62199. NNP14-RP/KP/NS.15-03276
02/24/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-05864
02/24/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2015MotionFiled Motion to Recall Remittitur. Nos. 61567/62199.15-06283
03/09/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Recall Remittitur. Nos. 61567/62199.15-07263
03/11/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 27, 2015.15-05864
06/04/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Motion denied." Before: Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. NNP14-RP/NS/KP Nos. 61567/6219915-17026