Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62241
Short Caption:MATTHEWS (JEMAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):49947, 50052, 58881, 66844, 77751
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228460Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/2013How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/06/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/06/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.12-38465
12/26/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal.12-40766
12/28/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court: written or minute order appointing appellate counsel due: 35 days.12-41095
01/22/2013Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on January 17, 2013 appointing William H. Gamage, Esq., of Gamage & Gamage as counsel for appellant.13-02218
01/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Appellant: Transcript Request and Docketing Statement due: 20 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.13-02432
03/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Transcript Request and Docketing Statement due: 10 days.13-07616
03/27/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeals.13-09137
03/27/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/12/12. To Court Reporter: Cheryl Carpenter.13-09138
04/26/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cheryl Carpenter stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/12/12.13-12332
05/24/2013MotionFiled Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief & Appendix (First Request)13-15323
05/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved Opening Brief Due June 24, 2013.13-15326
06/28/2013MotionFiled Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief & Appendix (Second Request).13-19054
07/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 15, 2013.13-19227
08/13/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Filing of Brief and Appendix.13-23692
08/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on August 13, 2013. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief.13-23917
08/14/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief.13-23918
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. I.13-23919
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. II.13-23921
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. III.13-23920
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. IV.13-23922
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. V.13-23923
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. VI.13-23924
08/14/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. VII.13-23925
09/10/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-26767
09/17/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to appellant Jemar Matthews in response to his letter.13-27386
10/24/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No Reply Brief Filed.
11/27/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.13-35893
12/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on November 27, 2013.13-36717
12/06/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-36718
12/06/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
01/16/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP14-JH/MD/MC14-01674
02/10/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-04264
02/10/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/19/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 12, 2014.14-04264