Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62308
Short Caption:BLUESTEIN VS. BLUESTEIN (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):46195, 70158
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D312975Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Pro Bono Program/Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/13/2014 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/13/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
12/18/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.)12-40047
12/20/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
12/31/2012Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.12-41227
01/28/2013BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.13-02879
03/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days.13-07660
03/25/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-6 (via ftp).13-08811
03/25/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/04/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Clarification.13-09936
08/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. The court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would benefit the court's review. If appellant does not wish to have pro bono counsel, appellant shall so advise the court in writing within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Appellate Law Section, Pro Bono Committee, State Bar of Nevada, for selection of pro bono counsel who shall, if pro bono counsel is accepted, enter an appearance for purposes of this appeal within 30 days from the date of this order.The clerk of this court shall establish a revised briefing schedule. Pro bono counsel shall appear at oral argument. This appeal no longer stands submitted for decision on the appeal statement. The appeal is stayed pending further order of this court.13-24852
09/17/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Seth T. Floyd, Esq. of the law firm of McDonald Carano Wilson, LLP, as attorney for Michael M. Bluestein.13-27423
09/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9 and Setting Briefing Schedule. Appellant: 14 days from the date of this order to file either a transcript request form or a certification that no transcripts are requested. In light of this order, we deny appellant's proper person motion for clarification regarding the transcripts filed on April 4, 2013, without prejudice to his right to renew his request for transcripts through counsel. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. We vacate the stay of this appeal imposed by our August 22, 2013, order.13-28131
10/02/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/27/12, 5/30/12, 8/30/12 and 11/1/12. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub.13-29407
11/05/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys, Emily McFarling of the law firm McFarling Law Group, for the Respondent.13-33210
11/13/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Shelly A. Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/17/12, 5/30/12, 8/30/12 and 11/01/12.13-33878
12/20/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-38751
12/20/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 113-38752
12/20/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 213-38753
12/20/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 313-38754
12/20/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Joint Appendix Volume 413-38755
12/20/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Addendum.13-38756
01/17/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Five Days).14-01845
01/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: January 28, 2014.14-01848
01/29/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-03001
02/14/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-04950
02/14/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Reply Addendum.14-04951
02/14/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, October 13, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shalle be limited to 30 minutes.14-24874
09/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-32452
10/13/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 - JH/MD/MC.
01/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Appellant counsel, Seth Floyd, is now with the Urban Law Firm.15-02330
03/26/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. EN BANC15-09140
04/20/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-11840
04/20/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 23, 2015.15-11840