The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62468
Short Caption:REEVES VS. DIV. OF INDUST. RELATIONSClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A644791Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/16/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/16/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/18/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
01/18/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.13-02078
01/18/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-02080
01/28/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey and Susan Reeves. Check No. 5983.
01/29/2013Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
03/14/2013BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.13-07707
04/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days.13-11935
04/30/2013Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-5. (Via FTP)13-12616
04/30/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/21/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Respondent Attorney of Record.(John Wiles).13-14999
10/17/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. This court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent appellant would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. Appellant may decline the appointment of pro bono counsel by filing a written objection in this court within 11 days from the date of this order. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. The Legal Aid Center shall have 30 days from the date of this order in which to file in this court a written determination of whether appellant meets the financial eligibility requirements. Within that same time period, the Legal Aid Center shall serve a copy of that written determination on the Pro Bono Committee, and file a certificate of service in this court. If appellant meets the financial eligibility requirements, and does not object to the appointment, the Pro Bono Committee shall have 30 days after the written determination is served in which to select pro bono counsel for appellant, and cause counsel to enter an appearance in this court. Supplemental briefing and oral argument will be scheduled thereafter. If appellant is not financially eligible for pro bono counsel, oral argument will not be held, and this case will stand submitted for decision on the appeal statement and record currently before the court.13-31308
11/21/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation.13-35263
12/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel on Behalf of Appellant Susan Reeves. (Attorney Maximiliano Couvillier III for appellant.)13-37703
12/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Statement of Legal Aid Representation (Pursuant to NRS 12.015).13-37704
12/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9 and Setting Briefing Schedule. This matter no longer stands submitted for decision on the appeal statement. Appellant: Transcript Request due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 120 days. Appellant shall state on the cover page of the opening brief whether it is a replacement brief or a supplement to appellant's previously filed proper person appeal statement.13-38913
01/06/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/13/13 To Court Reporter: Loree Murray.14-00302
04/10/2014MotionFiled Stipulation Stipulation to Extend Time To File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request)14-11618
04/10/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 22, 2014.14-11622
05/23/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (Supplement to Appellant's Previously Filed 3/14/13 Pro Per Appeal)14-16901
06/19/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief (First Request).14-20158
06/19/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: July 21, 2014.14-20195
06/24/2014MotionFiled Movant CCMSI's Motion for A Procedural Order to Amend Caption to add Movant as Essential Respondent.14-20762
07/21/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (CCMSI's )14-23608
07/22/2014BriefFiled Respondent Division of Industrial Relations' Joinder in Respondent CCMSI's Answering Brief.14-23717
08/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Add Respondent. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption to name Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc. as a respondent to this appeal.14-26220
08/20/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm by Appellant's Counsel (Maximiliano D. Couvillier III is no longer with Lionel Sawyer & Collins and is now with Black & LoBello).14-27537
08/21/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-27544
08/21/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-23757
09/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-26604
09/04/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Emergency Motion to Continue Oral Argument.15-26901
09/04/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Emergency Motion to Continue Oral Argument.15-26925
09/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for September 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated and this appeal will be scheduled for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on December 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-27069
11/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, December 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-34945
12/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-36730
12/16/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. (SNP15-RP/MD/MC).
01/27/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP15-RP/MD/MC.16-02878
02/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-05537
02/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 26, 2016.16-05537