The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62528
Short Caption:VILLA PALMS COURT 102 TRUST VS. RILEYClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A674595Case Status:Disposition Filed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:01/31/2013 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/07/2014 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/07/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/30/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
01/30/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-03160
01/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-03162
01/30/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael V. Infuso
01/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.13-03200
01/31/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin.13-03309
02/19/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.13-05214
02/20/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.13-05390
02/22/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/17/13 To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom.13-05637
02/27/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. While this appeal was assigned to the settlement program, appellant filed a transcript request form. Court reporter Isom: 30 days to file a certificate of acknowledgement. Opening brief due: 60 days. Fn1 [The clerk shall attach a copy of that transcript request form to this order.]13-06037
03/07/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/4/13.13-07048
04/25/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Appellant to File Opening Brief and Appendix Due May 24, 2013.13-12221
04/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix Due May 24, 2013.13-12224
05/24/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix volume 1.13-15516
05/28/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-15589
06/17/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondent to File Initial Brief.13-17733
06/17/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Brief due: July 26, 2013.13-17740
07/30/2013BriefFiled Answering Brief -Respondent's Opening Brief.13-22396
08/09/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. (DETACHED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER OF 9/03/13).13-23371
08/29/2013MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time for Appellant To File Reply Brief.13-25626
08/29/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: September 19, 2013.13-25635
09/03/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to detach the proposed brief from the August 9 motion and file it.13-25902
09/03/2013BriefFiled Amicus Brief In Support of Respondents William L. Riley and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada).13-25906
09/19/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.13-28011
09/19/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/02/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-00008
02/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation of Counsel. (Christopher M. Hunter is no longer associated with the firm McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, and accordingly is no longer counsel in this case).14-03488
02/25/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae.14-06178
02/26/2014BriefReceived State Bar of Nevada Real Property Section's Amicus Curiae Brief Regarding Lien Priority Issue.(FILED PER ORDER OF 2/26/14).
02/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief provisionally submitted on February 26, 2014. The parties shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file a response to the amicus brief. Any response shall be limited to 10 pages.14-06310
02/26/2014BriefFiled Amicus Brief -State Bar of Nevada Real Property Section's Amicus Curiae Brief Regarding Lien Priority Issue.14-06315
02/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, May 7, 2014, @ 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes.14-06555
03/07/2014BriefFiled Respondents's Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief by the State Bar of Nevada.14-07453
03/10/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Brief.14-07499
03/13/2014BriefFiled Apellant's Response to State Bar of Nevada Real Property Section's Amicus Curiae Brief Regarding Lien Priority Issue.14-08173
04/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice14-12831
05/07/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/25/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities.14-24293
11/10/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating and Remanding. "We VACATE the order denying preliminary injunctive relief and REMAND this matter for further proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC14-36976